This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2020 at 10:02:14 (UTC).

Benter v. Schmitz et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Benter filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Schmitz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alice R. Senechal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00181

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alice R. Senechal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dean Benter

Rogers, ND 58479

Defendants

Dan Heidbreder

Troy Kelly

State of North Dakota

Jesse M Smith

Kelly Wimer

Barnes County

Shawn Krebsbach

Jay Schmitz

Jim Shaw

Tonya Duffy

Shawn Banet

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Barnes County, State of North Dakota, Dan Heidbreder, Jay Schmitz, Jesse M Smith, Jim Shaw, Kelly Wimer, Shawn Banet, Shawn Krebsbach, Tonya Duffy, Troy Kelly against Dean Benter. Distributed on 10/27/2020. (lf) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and dismissing #4 Complaint. (AS) Distributed on 10/27/2020 (lf). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

6 #1

Mailing Envelope

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dean Benter. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Dean Benter. (pb) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Shawn Banet, Barnes County, Tonya Duffy, Dan Heidbreder, Troy Kelly, Shawn Krebsbach, Jay Schmitz, Jim Shaw, Jesse M Smith, State of North Dakota, Kelly Wimer (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Dean Benter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AKS) Distributed on 10/7/2020 (pb). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dean Benter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/20/2020. (sj) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

1 #2

Mailing Envelope

1 #1

Proposed Complaint and JS 44

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dean Benter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint and JS 44, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sj) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Barnes County, State of North Dakota, Dan Heidbreder, Jay Schmitz, Jesse M Smith, Jim Shaw, Kelly Wimer, Shawn Banet, Shawn Krebsbach, Tonya Duffy, Troy Kelly against Dean Benter. Distributed on 10/27/2020. (lf) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and dismissing #4 Complaint. (AS) Distributed on 10/27/2020 (lf). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dean Benter. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Dean Benter. (pb) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Shawn Banet, Barnes County, Tonya Duffy, Dan Heidbreder, Troy Kelly, Shawn Krebsbach, Jay Schmitz, Jim Shaw, Jesse M Smith, State of North Dakota, Kelly Wimer (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Dean Benter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AKS) Distributed on 10/7/2020 (pb). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dean Benter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/20/2020. (sj) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dean Benter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint and JS 44, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sj) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barnes County is a litigant