This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2019 at 07:43:09 (UTC).

BENSON v. BROWN

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 BENSON filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00065

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES A. BENSON

Carlisle, IN 47838

Defendants

RICHARD BROWN

CHRISTOPHER NICHOLSON

WABASH VALLEY CORR. FAC.

JERRY SNYDER

KEVIN GILLMORE

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Amended Complaint

#11

(#11) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES A. BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(MAT) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#10

(#10) Documents for Service by IDOC - re #9 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #8 Entry, #1 Complaint. (DMW) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to: 1) Richard Brown (DMW) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#8

(#8) Entry Screening Complaint, Dismissing Insufficient Claims, Directing Service of Process, and Directing Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction - The action shall proceed with Eighth and Fourteenth Amendment claims against Warden Brown in his official capacity. If the plaintiff believes that additional claims were alleged in the complaint but not identified by the Court, he shall have through April 26, 2019, in which to identify those claims. The clerk is directed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendant Richard Brown in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint filed on February 8, 2019 (docket #1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. The clerk shall terminate from the docket defendants Wabash Valley Corr. Fac., Kevin Gillmore, Jerry Snyder, and Christopher Nicholson. Warden Brown shall respond to the motion for preliminary injunction, dkt. #3 , on the same date he files his answer or other response to the complaint. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 3/29/2019. (DMW) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by CHARLES A. BENSON. (DMW) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#6

(#6) ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. No initial partial filing fee is due at this time. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 2/14/2019. (DMW) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#4

(#4) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES A. BENSON. (REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES A. BENSON. (REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit - Counselors Statement of Inmate Trust Fund Account

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES A. BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Counselors Statement of Inmate Trust Fund Account)(REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

1 #2

Waiver of Service of Summons

1 #1

Exhibit - Grievance documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against RICHARD BROWN, KEVIN GILMORE, CHRISTOPHER NICHOLSON, JERRY SNYDER, WABASH VALLEY CORR. FAC., filed by CHARLES A. BENSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Grievance documents, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons)(REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES A. BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(MAT) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Documents for Service by IDOC - re #9 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #8 Entry, #1 Complaint. (DMW) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to: 1) Richard Brown (DMW) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry Screening Complaint, Dismissing Insufficient Claims, Directing Service of Process, and Directing Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction - The action shall proceed with Eighth and Fourteenth Amendment claims against Warden Brown in his official capacity. If the plaintiff believes that additional claims were alleged in the complaint but not identified by the Court, he shall have through April 26, 2019, in which to identify those claims. The clerk is directed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendant Richard Brown in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint filed on February 8, 2019 (docket #1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. The clerk shall terminate from the docket defendants Wabash Valley Corr. Fac., Kevin Gillmore, Jerry Snyder, and Christopher Nicholson. Warden Brown shall respond to the motion for preliminary injunction, dkt. #3 , on the same date he files his answer or other response to the complaint. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 3/29/2019. (DMW) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by CHARLES A. BENSON. (DMW) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. No initial partial filing fee is due at this time. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 2/14/2019. (DMW) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES A. BENSON. (REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES A. BENSON. (REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CHARLES A. BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Counselors Statement of Inmate Trust Fund Account)(REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against RICHARD BROWN, KEVIN GILMORE, CHRISTOPHER NICHOLSON, JERRY SNYDER, WABASH VALLEY CORR. FAC., filed by CHARLES A. BENSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Grievance documents, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons)(REO) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less