This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:07:02 (UTC).

Margo Benson-Hammer et al v. San Luis Obispo County et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Margo Benson-Hammer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against San Luis Obispo County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02790

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Margo Benson-Hammer

Estate of Russell Hammer

Defendants

Tim Olivas

San Luis Obispo County

San Luis Obispo County Department of Public Health

Jeff Hamm

Sheriff Ian Parkinson

Dr. Maria Ilano

San Luis Obispo County Sheriffs Department

Does 1 through 100, individually, jointly and severally

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paula Kay Canny

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

13 #1

Appendix Summons Attachment

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Appendix Summons Attachment

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Estate of Russell Hammer, Margo Benson-Hammer. upon Jeff Hamm(individually) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Jeff Hamm(in his official capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Maria Ilano(individually) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Maria Ilano(in her official capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Tim Olivas(in his individual) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Tim Olivas(in his official capacities) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Ian Parkinson(in his individual) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Ian Parkinson(in his official capacities) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; San Luis Obispo County waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; San Luis Obispo County Department of Public Health waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; San Luis Obispo County Sheriffs Department waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Jonathan Belaga. (Canny, Paula) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Does, Jeff Hamm (individually), Jeff Hamm (in his official capacity), Maria Ilano (individually), Maria Ilano (in her official capacity), Tim Olivas (in his individual), Tim Olivas (in his official capacities), Ian Parkinson (in his individual), Ian Parkinson (in his official capacities), San Luis Obispo County, San Luis Obispo County Department of Public Health, San Luis Obispo County Sheriffs Department. (bm) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by Plaintiff Margo Benson-Hammer, Estate of Russell Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summons Attachment)(Canny, Paula) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Margo Benson-Hammer, Estate of Russell Hammer. (Canny, Paula) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #5 RE: Complaint (Notice of Interested Parties), #1 by Clerk of Court. Plaintiff shall file Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. (bm) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #8 RE: Civil Cover Sheet and Sumons [1-1, 1-2], Summons #7 by Clerk of Court. Document 7 is STRICKEN and shall be filed in accordance with the Local Rules of this Court forthwith. Attachment 1 and 2 shall be filed as separate documents forthwith. (bm) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #7 . The following error(s) was found: Case number and judge's initials are not indicated in the caption of the attached document. At least one defendant should be named in the "To:" section of the summons, and then if there is not enough room to indicate all defendants, type "see attached", and attach a caption of the complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bm) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 4/16/19. Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #6 filed by Plaintiff Margo Benson-Hammer, Estate of Russell Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summons Attachment)(Canny, Paula) Modified on 4/16/2019 (bm). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cove Sheet and No. 2 Summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23535220 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Margo Benson-Hammer, Russell Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Summons) (Attorney Paula Kay Canny added to party Margo Benson-Hammer(pty:pla), Attorney Paula Kay Canny added to party Russell Hammer(pty:estp))(Canny, Paula) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less