This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2020 at 08:32:20 (UTC).

Benoit v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Benoit filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis Guirola, Jr

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andre James Benoit

Defendants

BP America Production Company

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albertus F. Wiesedeppe

Attorney at Nations Law Firm

9703 Richmond Ave., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042-4863

Gary L. Fuller

Attorney at Nations Law Firm

9703 Richmond Ave., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042-4863

Howard L. Nations - PHV

Attorney at THE NATIONS LAW FIRM

9703 Richmond Avenue, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Clare Smith Millette

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Edderek Linnel Cole

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Charles (Chan) E. McLeod

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Thomas W. Tardy, III

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company, and by Andre James Benoit (Nicks, Shantrell) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Millette on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Millette, Clare) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan)) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#8

(#8) Letter sent to Hodges, Lucier, McEldowney, Reid, Seiler, Nations, Wiesedeppe and Fuller on 3/5/20 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-13308. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#6

(#6) Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi.IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2020.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#5

(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Andre James Benoit. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) Modified text/filers on 2/27/2020 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 11/27/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/30/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7925171) filed by Andre James Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Andre James Benoit(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company, and by Andre James Benoit (Nicks, Shantrell) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY; Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY; Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY; Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY and Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY terminated. Mr. Haycraft is not shown as counsel on the docket. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 19, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Millette on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Millette, Clare) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan)) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter sent to Hodges, Lucier, McEldowney, Reid, Seiler, Nations, Wiesedeppe and Fuller on 3/5/20 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-13308. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi.IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2020.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Andre James Benoit. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) Modified text/filers on 2/27/2020 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7925171) filed by Andre James Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Andre James Benoit(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edderek Linnel Cole