This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 10:08:34 (UTC).

Bennett v. Wexford of Indiana et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Bennett filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wexford of Indiana. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert L Miller, Jr and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01074

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert L Miller, Jr

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Bennett

Westville, IN 46391

Defendants

Kristie Hammar

Sergeant Bach

Wexford of Indiana

Officer Frame

Sergeant Leeth

J Miller

Daniel Pomeroy

Solomon

Andrew Liaw

K Kranick

John Galipeau

S Miller

Livers

William Brown

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER DENYING #2 Unsigned Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #3 Motion for Leave to File a Separate Civil Action; GRANTING #9 Signed Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/12/2020. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(mrm) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sergeant Bach, William Brown, Officer Frame, John Galipeau, Kristie Hammar, K Kranick, Sergeant Leeth, Andrew Liaw, Livers, J Miller, S Miller, Daniel Pomeroy, Solomon, Wexford of Indiana, filed by Kevin Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae) (Entered: 01/04/2020)

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

Letter with file stamp

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (resubmitted with signature) (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Kevin Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Letter with file stamp, #2 Envelope)(nae) (Entered: 01/04/2020)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned from Kevin Bennett as Undeliverable - #4 Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Released, return to sender) *address previously updated* (mlc) Modified on 12/18/2019 (nae). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION to Extend Deadline by Plaintiff Kevin Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rmc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Bennett from Westville Correctional Control Unit to 9402 E 43rd Street, Indianapolis, IN 46235. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned from Kevin Bennett as Undeliverable - Released, Return to Sender "DCHG" (Discharged)- (copy of docket sheet) (rmc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Kevin Bennett is GRANTED until 12/10/2019 to file a signed complaint and resolve his filing fee status. He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/22/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) (unsigned) MOTION for Leave to File a Separate Civil Action by Plaintiff Kevin Bennett. (nae) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#2

(#2) (unsigned) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Kevin Bennett. (nae) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

1 #4

Proposed summons and USM 285 forms

1 #3

Letter to Clerk

1 #1

Exhibit

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER DENYING #2 Unsigned Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #3 Motion for Leave to File a Separate Civil Action; GRANTING #9 Signed Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/12/2020. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(mrm) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sergeant Bach, William Brown, Officer Frame, John Galipeau, Kristie Hammar, K Kranick, Sergeant Leeth, Andrew Liaw, Livers, J Miller, S Miller, Daniel Pomeroy, Solomon, Wexford of Indiana, filed by Kevin Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae) (Entered: 01/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (resubmitted with signature) (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Kevin Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Letter with file stamp, #2 Envelope)(nae) (Entered: 01/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Mail Returned from Kevin Bennett as Undeliverable - #4 Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Released, return to sender) *address previously updated* (mlc) Modified on 12/18/2019 (nae). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Extend Deadline by Plaintiff Kevin Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rmc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Bennett from Westville Correctional Control Unit to 9402 E 43rd Street, Indianapolis, IN 46235. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Mail Returned from Kevin Bennett as Undeliverable - Released, Return to Sender "DCHG" (Discharged)- (copy of docket sheet) (rmc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Kevin Bennett is GRANTED until 12/10/2019 to file a signed complaint and resolve his filing fee status. He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/22/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) (unsigned) MOTION for Leave to File a Separate Civil Action by Plaintiff Kevin Bennett. (nae) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) (unsigned) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Kevin Bennett. (nae) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (unsigned) PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sergeant Bach, William Brown, Officer Frame, John Galipeau, Kristie Hammar, K Kranick, Sergeant Leeth, Andrew Liaw, Livers, J Miller, S Miller, Daniel Pomeroy, Solomon, Wexford of Indiana, filed by Kevin Bennett. (Returned docket sheet with case number to Bennett) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Affidavit, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed summons and USM 285 forms, #5 Envelope)(nae) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Livers is a litigant

Latest cases where SOLOMON AKA DONALD RAY SOLOMON AKA DON R, DONALD R. is a litigant

Latest cases where WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC is a litigant