This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2020 at 13:40:07 (UTC).

BENNETT v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 BENNETT filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03048

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBORAH BENNETT

Defendant

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN S. FABRICANT

Attorney at BATHGATE, WEGENER & WOLF, PC

One Airport Road

Lakewood, NJ 08701

Defendant Attorney

RANDI F. KNEPPER

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH, MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLC

1300 Mt. Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KNEPPER, RANDI) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 3:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/14/2020. (jem) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KNEPPER, RANDI) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEBORAH BENNETT. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (FABRICANT, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10573490), filed by DEBORAH BENNETT.(FABRICANT, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KNEPPER, RANDI) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 3:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/14/2020. (jem) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KNEPPER, RANDI) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEBORAH BENNETT. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (FABRICANT, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10573490), filed by DEBORAH BENNETT.(FABRICANT, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANDI F. KNEPPER