This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:55:45 (UTC).

Bennett v. Clark et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Bennett filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Clark. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00269

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malcolm Bennett, Jr

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

CO Dantzler

William Little

David Clark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Milwaukee County - 550, 555

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Malcolm Bennett, Jr. (lh)

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/22/2019. On or before 3/15/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $13.41 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Malcolm Bennett and Warden at Columbia Correctional Institution)(cb)

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Malcolm Bennett, Jr. (lh)

#4

(#4) LETTER from the clerk to Malcolm Bennett, Jr. re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (lh)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $13.41, receipt number MK4689-076848. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Malcolm Bennett, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/22/2019. On or before 3/15/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $13.41 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Malcolm Bennett and Warden at Columbia Correctional Institution)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from the clerk to Malcolm Bennett, Jr. re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Malcolm Bennett, Jr. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Malcolm Bennett, Jr. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Malcolm Bennett, Jr. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.