Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2019 at 08:20:17 (UTC).

Bennett et al v. Mays, et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Bennett filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Mays. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Aleta A. Trauger and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00473

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leviticus Dunlap

Nashville, TN 37209

Terrance Simmons

Nashville, TN 37209

Lesergio Wilson

Nashville, TN 37209

Richard Ross

Nashville, TN 37209

Arthurio Morris

Nashville, TN 37209

Jeremy Rease

Nashville, TN 37209

Walshaude Vaughter

Nashville, TN 37209

Matthew Skaggs

Nashville, TN 37209

Kelven Dozier

Nashville, TN 37209

Antwain Monfort

Nashville, TN 37209

Zaccheus Scott

Nashville, TN 37209

Jaqui Dawson

Nashville, TN 37209

Corey Bennett

Nashville, TN 37209-1048

Quanta Parker

Nashville, TN 37209

Dequon Boyd

Nashville, TN 37209

Corey Somerville

Nashville, TN 37209

Jarvis Hoover

Nashville, TN 37209

Defendants

Tony Mays

Kelly Hunt

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER: Accordingly, Bennett's motion to dismiss these eight cases is GRANTED. The cases are DISMISSED. All other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/15/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Corey Bennett. (am) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE: Docket Sheet Request by Corey Bennett. (am) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE: Docket Sheet Request by Corey Bennett. (Pro se party sent a docket sheet by regular mail.) (am) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Corey Bennett. (am) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE THREE-STRIKES PROVISION OF THE PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT TO TERMINATED CO-PLAINTIFFS: The Court has determined that all of the plaintiffs in these cases except Corey Bennett were included in the action by Bennett without their knowledge or consent. Accordingly, all of the named plaintiffs except Bennett have been terminated as parties. This termination DOES NOT count as a strike against any plaintiff removed from the action for purposes of the three-strikes provision of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/18/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Corey Bennett is therefore BARRED from filing any civil case in this Court including any person other than himself as a plaintiff. If Bennett does not comply with this sanction, the Court will impose monetary penalties, additional filing restrictions, or both. In accordance with this sanction, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate all individuals other than Corey Bennett as plaintiffs in Bennett's pending cases. The Clerk of Court is also DIRECTED not to record any individual as a plaintiff in any case Bennett may file in the future other than Bennett himself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/18/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/17/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kelly Hunt, Tony Mays, filed by Terrance Simmons, Corey Somerville, Matthew Skaggs, Jeremy Rease, Corey Bennett, Zaccheus Scott, Dequon Boyd, Leviticus Dunlap, Lesergio Wilson, Arthurio Morris, Antwain Monfort, Quanta Parker, Walshaude Vaughter, Richard Ross, Jaqui Dawson, Kelven Dozier, Jarvis Hoover.(afs) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Accordingly, Bennett's motion to dismiss these eight cases is GRANTED. The cases are DISMISSED. All other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/15/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Corey Bennett. (am) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE: Docket Sheet Request by Corey Bennett. (am) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE: Docket Sheet Request by Corey Bennett. (Pro se party sent a docket sheet by regular mail.) (am) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Corey Bennett. (am) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE THREE-STRIKES PROVISION OF THE PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT TO TERMINATED CO-PLAINTIFFS: The Court has determined that all of the plaintiffs in these cases except Corey Bennett were included in the action by Bennett without their knowledge or consent. Accordingly, all of the named plaintiffs except Bennett have been terminated as parties. This termination DOES NOT count as a strike against any plaintiff removed from the action for purposes of the three-strikes provision of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/18/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Corey Bennett is therefore BARRED from filing any civil case in this Court including any person other than himself as a plaintiff. If Bennett does not comply with this sanction, the Court will impose monetary penalties, additional filing restrictions, or both. In accordance with this sanction, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate all individuals other than Corey Bennett as plaintiffs in Bennett's pending cases. The Clerk of Court is also DIRECTED not to record any individual as a plaintiff in any case Bennett may file in the future other than Bennett himself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/18/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/17/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kelly Hunt, Tony Mays, filed by Terrance Simmons, Corey Somerville, Matthew Skaggs, Jeremy Rease, Corey Bennett, Zaccheus Scott, Dequon Boyd, Leviticus Dunlap, Lesergio Wilson, Arthurio Morris, Antwain Monfort, Quanta Parker, Walshaude Vaughter, Richard Ross, Jaqui Dawson, Kelven Dozier, Jarvis Hoover.(afs) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less