This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2022 at 08:36:46 (UTC).

Bennefield v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 Bennefield filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nicholas A Danella. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00280

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas A Danella

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Bennefield

Defendants

Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miles Clayborn Williams

Attorney at The Martin Law Group, LLC

P.O. Box 20087, Ste. 1

Tuscaloosa, AL 35402-0087

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Robinett

Attorney at NORMAN WOOD KENDRICK & TURNER

Ridge Park Place, Suite 3000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joshua Bennefield.(DNW) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Joshua Bennefield. (DNW) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL: You must complete the attached form to indicate whether you consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge or decline to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge. (DNW) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company via certified mail. (DNW) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (DNW) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (DNW) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company of settlement (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company of settlement (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER: Defendants' "Unopposed Motion Regarding Deadline For Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint" (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint now is due on or before April 27, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 03/25/2022. (ALD, ) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (DNW) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (DNW) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company via certified mail. (DNW) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4028642 (B4601118867). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joshua Bennefield.(DNW). (Williams, Miles) Modified on 3/3/2022 (DNW, ). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL: You must complete the attached form to indicate whether you consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge or decline to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge. (DNW) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Joshua Bennefield. (DNW) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joshua Bennefield.(DNW) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Robinett