This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2020 at 11:00:04 (UTC).

Benjamin v. Unlimited Progress Corp.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Benjamin filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Unlimited Progress Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03374

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Renicia Benjamin

Defendant

Unlimited Progress Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian John Olszewski

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Lee Tinaglia, Ltd.

444 N. Northwest Highway, Suite 350

Park Ridge, IL 60068

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The parties are to file a joint status report by by 8/18/2020. See Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases for the content of the status report.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Renicia Benjamin by Brian John Olszewski (Olszewski, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Olszewski, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Renicia Benjamin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17090530.(Olszewski, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The parties are to file a joint status report by by 8/18/2020. See Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases for the content of the status report.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Unlimited Progress Corp. (ng, ) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Renicia Benjamin by Brian John Olszewski (Olszewski, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Olszewski, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Renicia Benjamin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17090530.(Olszewski, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less