This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 09:20:17 (UTC).

Benjamin v. Shinn et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Benjamin filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Shinn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are G Murray Snow, Michael T Morrissey (PS) and Michael T Morrissey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01992

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

Referral Judges

Michael T Morrissey (PS)

Michael T Morrissey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Elliot Benjamin

Phoenix, AZ 85068

Defendants

David Shinn

Richard Pratt

Larry L Gann, Jr.

Centurion of Arizona LLC

Abel Salazar

Laura Palmer-Neefe

Unknown Parties

 

Court Documents

10 #6

Exhibit E-J

10 #5

Exhibit A-D

10 #4

Complaint

10 #3

Serv Pkt 2

10 #2

Serv Pkt 1

10 #1

Serv Letter

#10

(#10) ORDER (Service Packet) - Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #8 ) and Motion to Allow Electronic Filing (Doc. #9 ) are granted. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within 5 days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Plaintiff's First Cause of Action is dismissed.(5) Defendants Shinn, Pratt, Gann, and Salazar are dismissed without prejudice.(6) Defendant Palmer-Neefe must answer Plaintiffs Second Cause of Action. Defendant Centurion must answer Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Centurion and Palmer-Neefe. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Morrissey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/20/22. (Attachments: #1 Serv Letter, #2 Serv Pkt 1, #3 Serv Pkt 2, #4 Complaint, #5 Exhibit A-D, #6 Exhibit E-J) (DXD) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Jason Elliot Benjamin (7 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Elliot Benjamin (5 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/7/21. (DXD) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Elliot Benjamin. (4 pages) (HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Part 3 of 3

1 #2

Exhibit Part 2 of 3

1 #1

Exhibit Part 1 of 3

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jason Elliot Benjamin. (166 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (Service Packet) - Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #8 ) and Motion to Allow Electronic Filing (Doc. #9 ) are granted. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within 5 days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Plaintiff's First Cause of Action is dismissed.(5) Defendants Shinn, Pratt, Gann, and Salazar are dismissed without prejudice.(6) Defendant Palmer-Neefe must answer Plaintiffs Second Cause of Action. Defendant Centurion must answer Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Centurion and Palmer-Neefe. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Morrissey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/20/22. (Attachments: #1 Serv Letter, #2 Serv Pkt 1, #3 Serv Pkt 2, #4 Complaint, #5 Exhibit A-D, #6 Exhibit E-J) (DXD) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Jason Elliot Benjamin (7 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Elliot Benjamin (5 pages). (DXD) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/7/21. (DXD) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Submitted by Jason Elliot Benjamin. (12 pages) (HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Jason Elliot Benjamin. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Elliot Benjamin. (4 pages) (HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jason Elliot Benjamin. (166 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(HLA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion of Arizona LLC is a litigant