This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2019 at 07:48:04 (UTC).

Benitez v. Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Benitez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael P. Shea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01377

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Benitez

Defendant

Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew D. Paradisi

Attorney at Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP

364 Franklin Avenue

Hartford, CT 06114

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah R. Skubas

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, CT

90 State House Sq., 8Th Fl.

Hartford, CT 06103-3708

Alexa M. Farmer

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, CT

90 State House Sq., 8Th Fl.

Hartford, CT 06103-3708

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#14

12 #1

Standing Order on Removed Cases

#12

#11

#10

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' 26(f) report and enters the attached scheduling order. The parties have indicated interest in an early settlement conference. However, given the current workload and busy schedules of the Magistrate Judges in this district, it is likely that any settlement conference would not take place until December or January, at the earliest. If the parties agree, the Court is willing to appoint a para-judicial officer to conduct the mediation on a pro-bono basis. The para-judicial officer would have substantial experience in the relevant area of law. It is likely that such an approach would allow for a mediation on a much more prompt schedule, one that, if a settlement results, would spare the parties time and resources. Within 7 days of this order, the parties are directed to file a joint statement indicating whether they wish to proceed to mediation with a Magistrate Judge or whether they consent to the appointment by the Court of a para-judicial officer to conduct the mediation. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/31/2019. (Karpman, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Answer deadline updated for Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. to 11/12/2019. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER. Defendant's #14 motion for extension is GRANTED. Defendant's pleading in response to Plaintiff's [1-1] complaint will be due November 12, 2019. The Court is unlikely to further extend this deadline.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/10/2019. (Karpman, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Extension of Time until November 11, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Answer deadline updated for Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. to 10/12/2019. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER. Defendant's #7 motion for extension is GRANTED. Defendant's pleading in response to Plaintiff's [1-1] complaint is due October 12, 2019.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/10/2019. (Karpman, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc., #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc., #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc., #11 Protective Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc., #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 09/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Peterson, M) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/05/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/05/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2019. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 09/05/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Maggie McFly's Management Corporation for Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Statement Regarding Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1441 (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Notice of Pending Motions (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa M. Farmer on behalf of Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. (Farmer, Alexa) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc. from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV-19-6115703-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5427063, filed by Maggie's Glastonbury, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexa M. Farmer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah R. Skubas