This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2021 at 19:53:01 (UTC).

Benedicto v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Benedicto filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart and Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-80131

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Defendants

PAI Holdings, LLC, formerly known as Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc.

Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Chattem, Inc.

Sam's West, Inc.

Humana Pharmacy Solutions, Inc.

Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc.

Novitium Pharma LLC

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Mylan Institutional LLC

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.

Kaiser Permanente International

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Giant Eagle, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Torrent Pharma Inc.

Ranbaxy Inc.

Auro Health, LLC

Rite Aid Corporation

Pfizer Inc.

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lauren Ashley Levitt

Attorney at Mase Mebane , Briggs

11870 Sw 94 Street

Miami, FL 33186

Curtis Jay Mase

Attorney at Mase Mebane & Briggs, P.A.

2601 South Bayshore Drive, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT (Short Form) against All Defendants, filed by Ricardo Benedicto.(Levitt, Lauren) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14265276, filed by Ricardo Benedicto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levitt, Lauren) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT (Short Form) against All Defendants, filed by Ricardo Benedicto.(Levitt, Lauren) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80131-RLR with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14265276, filed by Ricardo Benedicto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levitt, Lauren) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auro Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GIANT EAGLE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Novitium Pharma LLC is a litigant