This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:35:36 (UTC).

Bender, Joseph et al v. State of Wisconsin et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Bender, Joseph filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Wisconsin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tyler S. Holman

Joseph W. Bender

Jeremy W. Stroebel

Chelsea N. Cadotte

Thomas G. White, Jr.

Tyler J. Hood

Peng N. Lor

Stanchelle L. Hankins

Aric A. Elmore

Cody L. Hansen

Homer D. Taylor, Jr.

Bryant J. Swiggum

Lindsy Mason, Jr.

Defendants

Kelli S. Thompson

Anthony S. Evers

State of Wisconsin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Blake Gross

Attorney at Haukaas Law Office, S.C.

200 Chapple Avenue

Ashland, WI 54806

H. Craig Haukaas

Attorney at Haukaas Law Office, S.C.

101 West Main St., Suite 201

Ashland, WI 54806

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony David Russomanno

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W Main St, Po Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707

Colin Thomas Roth

Attorney at State of Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main St., Po Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Haukaas, H.) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony David Russomanno for Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. (Russomanno, Anthony) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#7

(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Roth, Colin) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Colin Thomas Roth for Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. (Roth, Colin) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Proof of Service as to Wisconsin Attorney General Joshua Kaul. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 1/22/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kelli S. Thompson served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Haukaas, H.) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Anthony S. Evers served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Haukaas, H.) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

2 #2

Summons Issued as to Kelli S. Thompson

2 #1

Summons Issued as to Anthony S. Evers

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Anthony S. Evers, #2 Summons Issued as to Kelli S. Thompson) (kwf) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391378.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Haukaas, H.) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Haukaas, H.) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony David Russomanno for Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. (Russomanno, Anthony) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due 3/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/29/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Roth, Colin) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Colin Thomas Roth for Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. (Roth, Colin) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proof of Service as to Wisconsin Attorney General Joshua Kaul. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 1/22/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kelli S. Thompson served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Haukaas, H.) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Anthony S. Evers served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Haukaas, H.) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Anthony S. Evers, #2 Summons Issued as to Kelli S. Thompson) (kwf) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391378.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Haukaas, H.) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.