This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2019 at 07:43:00 (UTC).

BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY v. COLUR WORLD, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against COLUR WORLD, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02188

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY

Defendant and Counter Claimant

COLUR WORLD, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL E. BREWER

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103-6996

JEFFREY L. EICHEN

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

222 Delaware Ave, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

SAMAR ARYANI-SABET

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

130 North 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

TIMOTHY D. PECSENYE

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

One Logan Sq

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [UNOPPOSED] filed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(BREWER, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY. COLUR WORLD, LLC waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (BREWER, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY.(ahf,) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS GRANTED AND BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO DEFENDANT COLUR WORLD, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS ON OR BEFORE 9/3/2019. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/1/2019.7/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. PECSENYE on behalf of COLUR WORLD, LLC with Certificate of Service(PECSENYE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COLUR WORLD, LLC.(ARYANI-SABET, SAMAR) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #7

Designation Form

#5

(#5) Colur World, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY by COLUR WORLD, LLC.(ARYANI-SABET, SAMAR) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COLUR WORLD, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197607.), filed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Designation Form, #8 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #8

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY L. EICHEN on behalf of BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(EICHEN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS GRANTED AND BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO DEFENDANT COLUR WORLD, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS ON OR BEFORE 9/3/2019. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/1/2019.7/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [UNOPPOSED] filed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(BREWER, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. PECSENYE on behalf of COLUR WORLD, LLC with Certificate of Service(PECSENYE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COLUR WORLD, LLC.(ARYANI-SABET, SAMAR) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Colur World, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY by COLUR WORLD, LLC.(ARYANI-SABET, SAMAR) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY. COLUR WORLD, LLC waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (BREWER, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY L. EICHEN on behalf of BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(EICHEN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY. (ahf) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY.(ahf,) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Summons Issued as to COLUR WORLD, LLC. 1 Given To: Counsel on 5/21/2019 (ahf) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COLUR WORLD, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197607.), filed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Designation Form, #8 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.