This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2019 at 07:29:47 (UTC).

Benchmark Electronics, Inc. v. Myers

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Benchmark Electronics, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Myers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benchmark Electronics, Inc.

Defendant

Nick Myers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter J Petesch

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

815 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20006

Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

815 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser on behalf of Benchmark Electronics, Inc. (Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Benchmark Electronics, Inc.. Benchmark Electronics, Inc. waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019.(Petesch, Peter) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Nick Myers.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT to Vacate Final Arbitration Award against Nick Myers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7804285.), filed by Benchmark Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Petesch, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser on behalf of Benchmark Electronics, Inc. (Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Benchmark Electronics, Inc.. Benchmark Electronics, Inc. waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019.(Petesch, Peter) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Nick Myers.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT to Vacate Final Arbitration Award against Nick Myers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7804285.), filed by Benchmark Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Petesch, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less