This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 08:02:45 (UTC).

Ben-Yosef v. SRC Energy Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Ben-Yosef filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against SRC Energy Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03182

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Ben-Yosef

Defendants

Raymond E. McElhaney

Paul Korus

Daniel E. Kelly

Jennifer S. Zucker

SRC Energy Inc.

Jack Aydin

Lynn A. Peterson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Adam Acocelli

Attorney at Weiss Law LLP

1500 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Richard Adam Acocelli on behalf of Michael Ben-Yosef (Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jack Aydin, Daniel E. Kelly, Paul Korus, Raymond E. McElhaney, Lynn A. Peterson, SRC Energy Inc., Jennifer S. Zucker (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6988327)Attorney Richard Adam Acocelli added to party Michael Ben-Yosef(pty:pla), filed by Michael Ben-Yosef. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/12/2019. Consent Form due by 1/14/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03182-NRN. (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/12/2019. Consent Form due by 1/14/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03182-NRN. (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Richard Adam Acocelli on behalf of Michael Ben-Yosef (Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jack Aydin, Daniel E. Kelly, Paul Korus, Raymond E. McElhaney, Lynn A. Peterson, SRC Energy Inc., Jennifer S. Zucker (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6988327)Attorney Richard Adam Acocelli added to party Michael Ben-Yosef(pty:pla), filed by Michael Ben-Yosef. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Acocelli, Richard) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.