This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:27:08 (UTC).

Ben Amara et al v. United States Department of State et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Ben Amara filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Department of State. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Jung and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02988

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mohamed Youssef Ben Amara

Mohamed Aziz Ben Amara

Riadh Ben Amara

Defendants

Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

William A. Barr

John Doe

United States Department of State

Michael R. Pompeo

Ken Cuccinelli

Joseph Langlois

Acting Secretary Chad Wolf

United States Department of Justice

Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

Chad Wolf

Wiliam P. Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morten Bo Christoffersen

Attorney at Center for US Immigration Services

4004 West Waters Avenue, Suite 5

Tampa, FL 33614

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/6/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF of service by Mohamed Aziz Ben Amara, Mohamed Youssef Ben Amara, Riadh Ben Amara (Christoffersen, Morten) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Michael R. Pompeo and United States Department of State. (LNR) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Riadh Ben Amara. (Christoffersen, Morten) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Mohamed Aziz Ben Amara. (Christoffersen, Morten) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/6/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mohamed Aziz Ben Amara, Mohamed Youssef Ben Amara, Riadh Ben Amara. Related case(s): no (TDC) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against William A. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Doe, Joseph Langlois, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of State, Chad Wolf Filing fee $400.00, receipt number TPA059153 filed by Mohamed Aziz Ben Amara, Riadh Ben Amara, Mohamed Youssef Ben Amara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(TDC) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.