This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2019 at 07:58:06 (UTC).

BEMIS v. SPENCER

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by BEMIS against SPENCER in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Maine District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00404

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

D. BROCK HORNBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICOLE BEMIS

Defendant

RICHARD V SPENCER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES G. NOUCAS, JR.

Attorney at NOUCAS LAW OFFICE

500 Market Street, Suite 8

Portsmouth, NH 03801

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by NICOLE BEMIS. RICHARD V SPENCER served on 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(NOUCAS, JAMES) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit Proof of Service

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against RICHARD V SPENCER with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NICOLE BEMIS. (Service of Process Deadline 12/4/2019) Fee due by 9/9/2019.(bfa) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to RICHARD V SPENCER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • Set Answer Deadline for RICHARD V SPENCER in accordance with Affadavit of Service: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (clp) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by NICOLE BEMIS. RICHARD V SPENCER served on 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(NOUCAS, JAMES) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2074231.), filed by NICOLE BEMIS.(NOUCAS, JAMES) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to RICHARD V SPENCER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against RICHARD V SPENCER with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NICOLE BEMIS. (Service of Process Deadline 12/4/2019) Fee due by 9/9/2019.(bfa) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less