This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:08:21 (UTC).

BEMBRY v. CHERRY, FEIGER & CHERRY, P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 BEMBRY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHERRY, FEIGER CHERRY, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Sharon A. King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01189

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNNIE BEMBRY

Defendants

CHERRY FEIGER & CHERRY, P.C. D/B/A THE CHERRY FIRM, P.C.

ESQ. THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR.

CHERRY, FEIGER & CHERRY, P.C. doing business as THE CHERRY FIRM, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID ANDREW BERLIN

Attorney at WEISBERG LAW

7 South Morton Avenue

Morton, PA 19070

GARY SCHAFKOPF

Attorney at HOPKINS & SCHAFKOPF, LLC

11 Bala Avenue

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

MATTHEW BENJAMIN WEISBERG

Attorney at WEISBERG LAW

7 South Morton Avenue

Morton, PA 19070

Defendant Attorney

MEREDITH KAPLAN STOMA

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH, LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, Suite 800

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for NJ Superior Court Summons and Complaint served on Thomas Fieger on 02/24/2022, filed by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR.(STOMA, MEREDITH) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Order Initial Conference set for 4/19/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/17/2022. (amv) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal As to Defendant Cherry, Fieger, & Cherry, P.C., d/b/a The Cherry Firm by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CHERRY, FIEGER & CHERRY, P.C.. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/23/2022. (amv) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint Discovery Plan by THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR.(STOMA, MEREDITH) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#10

(#10) Certification on behalf of THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR. (STOMA, MEREDITH) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Exhibit Curriculum Vitae

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ANDREW BERLIN on behalf of JOHNNIE BEMBRY (BERLIN, DAVID) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2022. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 8/19/2022. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in December, 2022; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/20/2022. (amv) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#14

(#14) DECLARATION of David A. Berlin, Esq. regarding third-party litigation funding by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of David A. Berlin, Esq. regarding third-party litigation funding by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2022. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 8/19/2022. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in December, 2022; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/20/2022. (amv) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/19/2022 by telephone. Scheduling Order to be entered (mb, ) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ANDREW BERLIN on behalf of JOHNNIE BEMBRY (BERLIN, DAVID) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Merit by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Curriculum Vitae)(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certification on behalf of THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR. (STOMA, MEREDITH) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Discovery Plan by THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR.(STOMA, MEREDITH) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CHERRY, FIEGER & CHERRY, P.C.. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/23/2022. (amv) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on April 19, 2022 at 10:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be submitted via email to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/22/22. (mb, ) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal As to Defendant Cherry, Fieger, & Cherry, P.C., d/b/a The Cherry Firm by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Initial Conference set for 4/19/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/17/2022. (amv) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR.(STOMA, MEREDITH) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for NJ Superior Court Summons and Complaint served on Thomas Fieger on 02/24/2022, filed by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOHNNIE BEMBRY. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (mag) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketOrder in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/7/2022. (mag) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. KMW. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (mag) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption, Cause of Action, Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mag) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketJudge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw) (Entered: 03/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number CAM-L-221-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13231446), filed by THOMAS J. FIEGER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(STOMA, MEREDITH) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meredith K. Stoma Esq.