This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 11:09:54 (UTC).

Beltran v. Charles, Jr.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Beltran filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Charles, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00486

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oscar O Beltran

Defendant

Isaac Jack Charles, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald George DeSimone

Attorney at DeSimone Law Office

4635 Southwest Freeway, Suite 850

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorneys

Russell Carter Lewis

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Houston

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana Street, 37Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Houston

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana Street, 37Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/3/2022 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/10/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Isaac Jack Charles, Jr. (Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Scheduling Order

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#8

(#8) FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION for Disclosure Initial Disclosures by Oscar O Beltran. (DeSimone, Donald) Modified on 11/1/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Oscar O Beltran (DeSimone, Donald) Modified on 10/12/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#6

(#6) FIRST AMENDED ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 10/19/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/30/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 10/19/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/29/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/3/2022 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/10/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 11/9/2021. Attorneys Present: Donald DeSimone, Benjamin E. Gonsoulin. Court will enter Scheduling Order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Isaac Jack Charles, Jr. (Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore doc #8, Pltf's Motion for Disclosure. This document is not a motion and it includes actual disclosure which is not accepted for filing. Attorney is instructed to re-file a notice of disclosure only. (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION for Disclosure Initial Disclosures by Oscar O Beltran. (DeSimone, Donald) Modified on 11/1/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Oscar O Beltran (DeSimone, Donald) Modified on 10/12/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AMENDED ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 10/19/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/30/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 10/19/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/29/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in state court) to #3 Original Petition by Isaac Jack Charles, Jr.(tkd, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against Isaac Jack Charles, Jr., filed by Oscar O Beltran.(tkd, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Isaac Jack Charles, Jr. (tkd, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin on behalf of All Defendants (Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Isaac Jack Charles, Jr. from 136th JDC, case number D-208084. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8600167), filed by Isaac Jack Charles, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Carter Lewis