This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:27:58 (UTC).

Beltex Corporation v. Robert Heath Trucking, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Beltex Corporation filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against Robert Heath Trucking, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terry R Means. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00133

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry R Means

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beltex Corporation

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

Robert Heath Logistics, Inc.

Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendant

Legal Freightlines, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tailim Song

Attorney at Tailim Song Law Firm

8111 Lbj Freeway, Suite 480

Dallas, TX 75251

Jordan Timothy Whiddon

Attorney at Tailim Song Law Firm

13140 Coit Road, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75240

Haben I Tewelde

Attorney at Tailim Song Law Firm

8111 Lbj Freeway, Suite 480

Dallas, TX 75251

Jennifer C. Ohn

Attorney at Tailim Song Law Firm

8111 Lbj Freeway, Suite 480

Dallas, TX 75251

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Vic H Henry

Attorney at Henry Oddo Austin & Fletcher PC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Emileigh Stewart Hubbard

Attorney at Henry Oddo Austin & Fletcher PC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION Substituted Service filed by Beltex Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc., Robert Heath Trucking, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (bdb) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#12

(#12) Request for Clerk to issue Default Judgment filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

12 #2

Proposed Order

12 #1

Affidavit(s)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Legal Freightlines, LLC ; served on 2/26/2019. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#10

(#10) Third-Party Summons Reissued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (bdb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#9

(#9) ***DISREGARD - SEE DOC 10 FOR SUMMONS*** Summons Issued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (mpw) Modified on 2/26/2019 (bdb). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#8

(#8) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Legal Freightlines, LLC filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. Clerk to issue third-party summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#7

(#7) Third Party Summons Issued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (mpw) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#6

(#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Legal Freightlines, LLC filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc.. Clerk to issue third-party summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mpw) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc., Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 2B

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION Substituted Service filed by Beltex Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc., Robert Heath Trucking, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (bdb) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Request for Clerk to issue Default Judgment filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Legal Freightlines, LLC ; served on 2/26/2019. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Third-Party Summons Reissued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (bdb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***DISREGARD - SEE DOC 10 FOR SUMMONS*** Summons Issued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (mpw) Modified on 2/26/2019 (bdb). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Legal Freightlines, LLC filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. Clerk to issue third-party summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Third Party Summons Issued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (mpw) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Legal Freightlines, LLC filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc.. Clerk to issue third-party summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Wed Feb 13 15:44:17 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mpw) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc., Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 236th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, case number 236-304923-18 filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc., Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9778335) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 2A, #4 Exhibit(s) 2B, #5 Exhibit(s) 2C, #6 Exhibit(s) 2D, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.