This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2022 at 07:35:24 (UTC).

Belsby v. Chevron USA Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 Belsby filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Chevron USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-PQ-01548

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Belsby

Defendants

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP

St John Hardware & Implement Co Inc

Syngenta AG

Syngenta Crop Protection LLC

Special Master

Randi Ellis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aimee H. Wagstaff

Attorney at Wagstaff Law Firm, PC

940 N. Lincoln St.

Denver, CO 80203

Khaldoun A. Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup, Melodia, Kelly & Schoenberger

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Meyers & Flowers, LLC

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 1515

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Shoemake Doles

Attorney at Carey Danis & Lowe - St. Louis

8235 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Andrew Sean Biviano

Attorney at Law Office of Andrew S. Biviano

1312 N. Monroe Street, Suite 285

Spokane, WA 99201

Defendant Attorneys

Jihan E. Walker

Attorney at Jones Day - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Megan Ann Scheiderer

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - Kansas City

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

Jason Levin

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Leslie M. Smith

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael J. Nester

Attorney at Donovan Rose Nester, P.C.

15 North First Street, Suite A

Belleville, IL 62220

Bradley H. Weidenhammer

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Ragan Naresh

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Washington DC

1301 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Rebecca C. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Angelo J Calfo

Attorney at Calfo Eakes & Ostrovsky PLLC

1301 Second Avenue, Ste 2800

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Levin, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 12/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Levin, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 12/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Southern District of Illinois. Signed by John W. Nichols, MDL Clerk. (CV, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 12/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/02/2021)

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee H. Wagstaff on behalf of Mary Belsby (Wagstaff, Aimee) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary Belsby (Wagstaff, Aimee) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation Regarding Proper Parties, Case Management Order No. 11, and Plaintiff's #7 Notice of Dismissal, Defendants St. John Hardware & Implement Co., Inc. and Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/7/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary Belsby (Wagstaff, Aimee) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee H. Wagstaff on behalf of Mary Belsby (Wagstaff, Aimee) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00327. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Southern District of Illinois. Signed by John W. Nichols, MDL Clerk. (CV, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 12/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 12/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Levin, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 12/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Levin, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 12/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3923536 Filed by Syngenta AG, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levin, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 12/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Syngenta Crop Protection L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant