2:22-CV-01333
07/27/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Civil Right - Employment Discrimination
Kimberly J. Mueller
Kendall J. Newman
Francisco Bello
American Bottling Company
Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.
Taylor Marcus
Joshua Shirian
David Daniel Bibiyan
Jeffrey Charles Bils
Daniel C. Whang
Laura E. Heyne
Main Document
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) DECLARATION of Daniel Whang re #1 Notice of Removal. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
(#3) DECLARATION of John Tynan re #1 Notice of Removal. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
Main Document
Standing Order
Consent Form
VDRP
(#6) JOINT STIPULATION to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline by American Bottling Company, et al. (Heyne, Laura) Modified on 8/15/2022 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 08/15/2022)
(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Charles Bils on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Bils, Jeffrey Charles added. (Bils, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Daniel Bibiyan on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Bibiyan, David Daniel added. (Bibiyan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by American Bottling Company, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
(#11) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Responsive Pleading Deadline by American Bottling Company, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
Docket(#11) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Responsive Pleading Deadline by American Bottling Company, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/30/2022: In light of the time needed for the parties to continue their meet and confer efforts on issues concerning a purported arbitration agreement, other cases with overlapping claims and possibly early resolution of this matter, the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint, is EXTENDED to 9/15/2022. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by American Bottling Company, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Daniel Bibiyan on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Bibiyan, David Daniel added. (Bibiyan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Charles Bils on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Bils, Jeffrey Charles added. (Bils, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) JOINT STIPULATION to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline by American Bottling Company, et al. (Heyne, Laura) Modified on 8/15/2022 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 08/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) DECLARATION of John Tynan re #1 Notice of Removal. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) DECLARATION of Daniel Whang re #1 Notice of Removal. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UOE-2022-5279 by all defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10350683) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
[-] Read Less