This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2022 at 09:46:12 (UTC).

Bello v. American Bottling Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Bello filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against American Bottling Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01333

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Bello

Defendants

American Bottling Company

Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.

Taylor Marcus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Shirian

David Daniel Bibiyan

Jeffrey Charles Bils

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel C. Whang

Laura E. Heyne

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Daniel Whang re #1 Notice of Removal. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of John Tynan re #1 Notice of Removal. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Standing Order

5 #2

Consent Form

5 #3

VDRP

#6

(#6) JOINT STIPULATION to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline by American Bottling Company, et al. (Heyne, Laura) Modified on 8/15/2022 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Charles Bils on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Bils, Jeffrey Charles added. (Bils, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Daniel Bibiyan on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Bibiyan, David Daniel added. (Bibiyan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by American Bottling Company, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Responsive Pleading Deadline by American Bottling Company, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Responsive Pleading Deadline by American Bottling Company, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/30/2022: In light of the time needed for the parties to continue their meet and confer efforts on issues concerning a purported arbitration agreement, other cases with overlapping claims and possibly early resolution of this matter, the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint, is EXTENDED to 9/15/2022. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by American Bottling Company, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Daniel Bibiyan on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Bibiyan, David Daniel added. (Bibiyan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Charles Bils on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Bils, Jeffrey Charles added. (Bils, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT STIPULATION to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline by American Bottling Company, et al. (Heyne, Laura) Modified on 8/15/2022 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of John Tynan re #1 Notice of Removal. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Daniel Whang re #1 Notice of Removal. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UOE-2022-5279 by all defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10350683) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less