This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2021 at 08:20:51 (UTC).

Bello-Castro v. All American Sports Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Bello-Castro filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against All American Sports Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher A. Boyko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00648

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher A. Boyko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McJerry Bello-Castro

Defendant

All American Sports Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick M. Bean

David E. Byrnes

 

Court Documents

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic case management conference to be held on 6/4/21 at 02:00 PM before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the conference call. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/18/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Exhibit B - Consent Package)(S,HR) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon All American Sports Corporation on 3/29/2021, filed on behalf of McJerry Bello-Castro. Related document(s) #2 . (S,AN) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to All American Sports Corporation placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 0700 0001 8423 9166. (H,SP) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All American Sports Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketJudge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for damages and reinstatement with jury demand against All American Sports Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number BOHNDC-10735752. Filed by McJerry Bello-Castro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - All American Sports Corporation). (Bean, Frederick) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less