This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2021 at 01:46:02 (UTC).

Bellflower Unified School District v. Fernando Lua et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Bellflower Unified School District filed an Other lawsuit against Fernando Lua. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03187

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Bellflower Unified School District

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Sandra Lua

Fernando Lua

Cross Claimant

Kimberly Lua

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

James DeRoche

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Richard Dale Brady

Eric J Bathen

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Tania L Whiteleather

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorney

James D DeRoche

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF LODGING filed (of Administrative Record) re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File #25 (Brady, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER GRANTING THIRD JOINT APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #24 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

24 #1

Proposed Order

24 #24

Main Document

#23

(#23) MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) James DeRoche: Mediation held on August 6, 2021. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(DeRoche, James) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING SECOND JOINT APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #21 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) James DeRoche has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF LODGING filed (of Administrative Record) re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File #25 (Brady, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER GRANTING THIRD JOINT APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #24 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Documents under Case Management Order (Third Joint Request) Bellflower Unified School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brady, Richard) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) James DeRoche: Mediation held on August 6, 2021. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(DeRoche, James) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING SECOND JOINT APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #21 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Documents under Case Management Order (Second Joint Request) Bellflower Unified School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brady, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) James DeRoche has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that James DeRoche may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 8/6/2021 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District(Brady, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Documents Pursuant to the Case Management Order Bellflower Unified School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brady, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-00043 FMO (FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03187 FMO (PVCx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (aco) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Fernando Lua, Sandra Lua. (esa) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District, (Bathen, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District. (Bathen, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District. (Bathen, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31111342 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District. (Attorney Eric J Bathen added to party Bellflower Unified School District(pty:pla))(Bathen, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less