This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2020 at 09:41:30 (UTC).

Bell v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 Bell filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodney Bell

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Graham Gamble

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Wesley T. Graham

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick R. Martin

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART PC (MN)

225 South 6Th Street, Suite 1800

Minneapols, MN 55402

Brian A. Moen

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART PC (MN)

225 South 6Th Street, Suite 1800

Minneapols, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#5

#7

#8

#10

#11

#12

#13

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Protective Order. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/17/2020. (k) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ***MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER*** STIPULATION for Protective Order by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Patrick) Modified on 8/14/2020 Corrected event to motion (slg). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conferences set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM, 12/4/2020 10:00 AM, 2/5/2021 10:00 AM and 4/5/2021 10:00 AM all in Phone Hearings(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearings will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/14/2020. (imk) Modified on 7/15/2020 removed extra text (slg). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/14/2020. (imk) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER adopting #8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 8/14/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 8/31/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/31/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/30/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/30/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 11/30/2020. Discovery Deadline 3/26/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/14/2020. (imk) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 7/13/2020. Attorney Wesley Graham appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Patrick Martin appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 13 minutes. (imk) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Graham, Wesley) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rodney Bell; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver served on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Graham, Wesley) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian A. Moen. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/1/2020. (kjw) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 in advance of the Scheduling Conference as discussed via email. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/25/2020. (imk) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Martin on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketChief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer no longer assigned to case. (don) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Rodney Bell. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/17/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/17/2020.(Graham, Wesley)$400.00 Filing Fee Receipt number 0863-4166393 Modified on 6/19/2020 (don). (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick R Martin