This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 08:58:42 (UTC).

Bell v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Bell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00368

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Bell

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Not Classified By Court

C Erik Chickedantz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel E Brophy

Attorney at Truitt Law Offices

2855 Northpark Ave Ste 107

Huntington, IN 46750

Phillip A Truitt

Attorney at Truitt Law Offices

2855 Northpark Ave Ste 107

Huntington, IN 46750

Richard Truitt

Attorney at Truitt Law Offices

2855 Northpark Ave Ste 107

Huntington, IN 46750

Defendant Attorney

Robert T Keen, Jr

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry Stpo Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B - Summons

1 #4

Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings

#2

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #3 Complaint for Personal Injuries by Walmart Inc..(Keen, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Inc.. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 11/17/2021. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 8/26/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 5/13/2022; and from Defendant by 6/24/2022. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 1/14/2022; as to Defendant is 2/25/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 9/30/2022 with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Erik Chickedantz as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/29/2021. (bas) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 11/17/2021. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 8/26/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 5/13/2022; and from Defendant by 6/24/2022. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 1/14/2022; as to Defendant is 2/25/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 9/30/2022 with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Erik Chickedantz as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/29/2021. (bas) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/29/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Phillip Truitt. Dft appeared by atty Robert Keen. Court addresses the amount in controversy. Parties advise a settlement demand has been made in excess of the $75,000 jurisdictional threshold. The #8 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Keen to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Truitt. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/19/2021. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Inc.. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #3 Complaint for Personal Injuries by Walmart Inc..(Keen, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (jdb) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T Keen, Jr on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4696786.) from Steuben Circuit Court, Cause No. 76C01-2109-CT-000403, filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings)(Keen, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert T Keen, Jr