This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2020 at 10:22:06 (UTC).

Bell v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Bell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine M. Menendez and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01393

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICOLAS BELL

Defendant

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy L Brantingham

Attorney at Brantingham Law Office, PA

2200 E Franklin Ave. Ste 202, Suspended 16-Mc-76 Jrt

Mpls, MN 55404

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Joel Martine Privert

Attorney at Union Pacific Railroad Company

101 North Wacker Drive, Ste 1920

Chicago, IL 60606

Thomas A.P. Hayden

Attorney at Union Pacific Railroad Company

101 North Wacker Dr., Ste 1920

Chicago, IL 60606

Dan J Gendreau

Attorney at Donna Law Firm, PC

7601 France Ave S Ste 350

Mpls, MN 55435

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a letter on or before 8/14/2020 advising the Court that he has mailed a petition for reinstatement to the Clerk of Court along with the miscellaneous filing fee. In the same letter, Plaintiff's counsel shall further advise the Court whether he currently receives electronic notifications and other correspondence at the email address on file with the Clerk, and if he does not, he must provide an active email address that he regularly reviews. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/3/2020.(BJP) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#15

(#15) REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas A. P. Hayden. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7890495 filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Gendreau, Dan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#12

(#12) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit(s) Affidavit

11 #2

Exhibit(s) Complaint

11 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) Affidavit)(Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Dan J Gendreau on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gendreau, Dan) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Union Pacific Railroad Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Joel Martine Privert on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER SEEKING 26(f) REPORT: Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/19/2020.(KAT) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 10th Judicial District, Anoka County, MN, case number 02-CV-20-2642 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7812162) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 Summons and Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a letter on or before 8/14/2020 advising the Court that he has mailed a petition for reinstatement to the Clerk of Court along with the miscellaneous filing fee. In the same letter, Plaintiff's counsel shall further advise the Court whether he currently receives electronic notifications and other correspondence at the email address on file with the Clerk, and if he does not, he must provide an active email address that he regularly reviews. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/3/2020.(BJP) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas A.P. Hayden for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/20/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas A. P. Hayden. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7890495 filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Gendreau, Dan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) Affidavit)(Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Dan J Gendreau on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gendreau, Dan) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Union Pacific Railroad Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Joel Martine Privert on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SEEKING 26(f) REPORT: Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/19/2020.(KAT) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1393 WMW/KMM. (CLK) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 10th Judicial District, Anoka County, MN, case number 02-CV-20-2642 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7812162) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 Summons and Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Privert, Sarah Joel) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less