This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 05:35:43 (UTC).

Bell v. Ortiz

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Bell filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Ortiz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-21262

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Roy Ricardo Bell

Joint Bade Mdl, NJ 08640

Respondent

DAVID ORTIZ

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Plaintiff's IFP application. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/13/2020. (cry, n.m.) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Roy Ricardo Bell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cry, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Directing Clerk to administratively terminate this action; If Petitioner wishes to re-open this action, he shall so notify the Court in writing, within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/13/2019. (rss, n.m. and ifp sent) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#6

(#6) OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/13/2019. (rss, n.m.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Roy Ricardo Bell. Filed in Eastern District of Virginia on 10/2/2019. This is the document that was attached to the Motion entry #2 on the docket from Eastern District of VA. (dmw) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00529. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) TRANSFER ORDER. it is ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff and effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/10/2019. Copies mailed 12/10/2019.(jmey, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION, Conditionally filed for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Roy Ricardo Bell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Plaintiff's IFP application. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/13/2020. (cry, n.m.) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREOPENING CASE: The Clerk is in receipt of the re #8 Application to Proceed IFP filed on 12/30/2019 and hereby reopens the case for review by a Judicial Officer. (sgf) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Roy Ricardo Bell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cry, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Directing Clerk to administratively terminate this action; If Petitioner wishes to re-open this action, he shall so notify the Court in writing, within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/13/2019. (rss, n.m. and ifp sent) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/13/2019. (rss, n.m.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Roy Ricardo Bell. Filed in Eastern District of Virginia on 10/2/2019. This is the document that was attached to the Motion entry #2 on the docket from Eastern District of VA. (dmw) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00529. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jmey, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) TRANSFER ORDER. it is ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff and effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/10/2019. Copies mailed 12/10/2019.(jmey, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roy Ricardo Bell. (jmey, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION, Conditionally filed for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Roy Ricardo Bell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.