This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 09:36:49 (UTC).

Bell v. Ikea US Retail, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Bell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ikea US Retail, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02769

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Dennis Bell

Defendant

IKEA US Retail, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley Ann Bosche

Attorney at Cockey Brennan and Maloney PC

313 Lemmon Hill Lane

Salisbury, MD 21801

Robin R Cockey

Attorney at Cockey Brennan and Maloney PC

313 Lemmon Hill Lane

Salisbury, MD 21801

Defendant Attorney

D Ontae D. Sylvertooth

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

1909 K Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Cover Letter Line

1 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) Jury Trial Demand by John Dennis Bell(Cockey, Robin) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to IKEA US Retail, LLC.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Dennis Bell. Ikea US Retail, LLC served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022.(Bosche, Ashley) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ikea US Retail, LLC identifying Corporate Parent IKEA Property, Inc., Other Affiliate IKEA Holding, U.S., Inc. for Ikea US Retail, LLC.(Sylvertooth, D Ontae) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Ikea US Retail, LLC answer due 12/19/2022.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/13/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Memorandum in Support of IKEA's Motion to Dismiss

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by John Dennis Bell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cockey, Robin) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by Ikea US Retail, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of IKEA's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sylvertooth, D Ontae) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Ikea US Retail, LLC answer due 12/19/2022.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/13/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ikea US Retail, LLC identifying Corporate Parent IKEA Property, Inc., Other Affiliate IKEA Holding, U.S., Inc. for Ikea US Retail, LLC.(Sylvertooth, D Ontae) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ikea US Retail, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sylvertooth, D Ontae) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Dennis Bell. Ikea US Retail, LLC served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022.(Bosche, Ashley) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to IKEA US Retail, LLC.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Jury Trial Demand by John Dennis Bell(Cockey, Robin) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against IKEA US Retail, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10237779.), filed by John Dennis Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter Line, #3 Summons)(Cockey, Robin) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less