This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 08:26:39 (UTC).

Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. NXP USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 Bell Semiconductor, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NXP USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roger T. Benitez, Cynthia Bashant and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00594

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

Presiding Judges

Roger T. Benitez

Cynthia Bashant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Semiconductor, LLC

Defendant

NXP USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan Peter Block

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Seth W. Wiener

Attorney at Law Offices of Seth W. Weiner

609 Karina Court

San Ramon, CA 94582

Defendant Attorney

Steven J. Corr

Attorney at Jones Day

555 S. Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No. #32 ) and Requiring Interim Status Reports. Case stayed until pending the final decision in ITC Investigation No. 337-TA-1319. Parties to file a joint status report no later than 12/21/22, and to file a joint status report every six months thereafter until ITC Investigation No. 337-TA-1319 has concluded. Parties to file a joint status report within ten (10) days after the ITC issues its final decision in Investigation No. 337-TA-1319. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/21/22. (jmo) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#33

(#33) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NXP USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NXP Semiconductors N.V., Corporate Parent NXP B.V., Corporate Parent Freescale Semiconductor Holdings V, Inc. for NXP USA, Inc... (Corr, Steven) (dlg). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

32 #2

Exhibit 2

32 #1

Exhibit 1

32 #32

Main Document

#31

(#31) ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of David Sochia, re #25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#30

(#30) ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ashley N. Moore, re #24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#25

(#25) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16889720.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sochia, David) (rmc). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#24

(#30) ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ashley N. Moore, re #24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827550.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Easley, Alexandra) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. NXP USA, Inc. served. (Wiener, Seth) (jmo). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Semiconductor, LLC.. (cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s): 7,007,259 B2 (cc: USPTO)(cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

1 #3

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #2

Report on Filing of Patent Action

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No. #32 ) and Requiring Interim Status Reports. Case stayed until pending the final decision in ITC Investigation No. 337-TA-1319. Parties to file a joint status report no later than 12/21/22, and to file a joint status report every six months thereafter until ITC Investigation No. 337-TA-1319 has concluded. Parties to file a joint status report within ten (10) days after the ITC issues its final decision in Investigation No. 337-TA-1319. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/21/22. (jmo) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NXP USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NXP Semiconductors N.V., Corporate Parent NXP B.V., Corporate Parent Freescale Semiconductor Holdings V, Inc. for NXP USA, Inc... (Corr, Steven) (dlg). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion for Mandatory Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659 Pending ITC Investigation by NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Corr, Steven)Attorney Steven J. Corr added to party NXP USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of David Sochia, re #25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ashley N. Moore, re #24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard A. Kamprath, re #26 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alexandra Easley, re #27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16889750.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Easley, Alexandra) (rmc). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16889740.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kamprath, Richard) (rmc). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16889720.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sochia, David) (rmc). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827605.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sochia, David) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827587.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Moore, Ashley) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827572.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kamprath, Richard) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827550.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Easley, Alexandra) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. NXP USA, Inc. served. (Wiener, Seth) (jmo). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv594-BAS-KSC.(no document attached) (ddf) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Semiconductor, LLC.. (cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s): 7,007,259 B2 (cc: USPTO)(cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against NXP USA, Inc. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16776473.), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Filing of Patent Action, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)The new case number is 3:22-cv-594-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Seth W. Wiener)(cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bell Semiconductor, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NXP USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven John Corr