This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2022 at 08:23:12 (UTC).

Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Micron Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On October 18, 2022, Bell Semiconductor, LLC (“Bell Semic” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Alexander P. McLaughlin and Jason Blakley of Givens Pursley LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Micron Technology, Inc. (“Micron” or “Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged infringement of the U.S. patent owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho, with Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. presiding. 

The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. patent No. 7,396,760 (“the ’760 patient”) owned by the plaintiff. 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged, “This is a patent infringement suit relating to Micron’s unauthorized and unlicensed use of the ʼ760 patent. The circuit design methodologies claimed in the ʼ760 patent are used by Micron in the production of one or more of its semiconductor chips, including at least the Micron 2200 MTFDHBA256TCK-1AS1AABYY 256GB NVMe PCIe3.0x4 TLC M.2 22x80mm SSD (‘Micron Accused Product’).”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Traditionally, the process flow for IC design is highly linear, with each phase of the design process depending on the previous steps. Accordingly, when revisions to portions of the physical design are made, as typically happens numerous times during the design process, all the subsequent steps typically need to be redone in their entirety for at least the layer, if not the entire device.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “This is because regardless of the size or extent of the revision to the physical design, the changes must be merged into a much larger integrated circuit design and then the remaining steps of the design process flow re-run. Semiconductor devices include different kinds of materials to function as intended. These layers—and interconnects and components formed within them—have gotten much smaller over time, increasing the performance of these devices dramatically.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “Manufacturers use a process called Chemical Mechanical Planarization/Polishing (‘CMP’) to smooth out the surface of the device to prepare the device for further processing, such as deposition of another layer. This allows subsequent layers to be built and connected more easily with fewer opportunities for short circuits or other errors that render the device defective.”

Additionally, Plaintiff alleged, “CMP functions best when there is a certain density and variance of the same material on the surface of the chip. This is because different materials will be ‘polished’ away at different rates, leading to erosion or dishing on the surface. To reduce this problem ‘dummy’ material, also known as ‘dummy fill’, is typically inserted into low-density regions of the device to increase the overall uniformity of the structures on the surface of the layer and reduce the density variability across the surface of the device.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “The inventions disclosed in the ’760 patent provide many advantages over the prior art. In particular, rearranging the dummy fill features such that they do not align vertically in successive layers can reduce unwanted bulk capacitance introduced by dummy fill and thus minimize the interlayer capacitance. Bell Semic brings this action to put a stop to Micron’s unauthorized and unlicensed use of the inventions claimed in the ʼ760 patent.”

Plaintiff presented one claim for relief from alleged infringement of the ’760 patent. 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested injunctive relief along with an award of damages with pre- and post-judgment interest. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00438

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Semiconductor, LLC

Defendant

Micron Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Reed Clayton

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Ave

Wilmington, DE 19806

Kathryn Elizabeth Yukevich

Attorney at McKool Smith

300 Crescent Court, Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Alexander P. McLaughlin

Attorney at Givens Pursley LLP

P O Box 2720

Boise, ID 83701

Jason Blakley

Attorney at Givens Pursley LLP

601 W Bannock Street

Boise, ID 83702

Defendant Attorneys

Jared Bobrow

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jason Lang

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jason K Yu

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jingyuan Luo

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Tammy Su

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Teague Ian Donahey

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

800 West Main Street, Suite 1750

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER. Defendants Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) is now due on January 13, 2023. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw)

25 #1

Declaration of Teague Donahey in Support

25 #25

Main Document

19 #8

Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Teague Donahey

19 #7

Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Teague Donahey

19 #6

Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Teague Donahey

19 #5

Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Teague Donahey

19 #3

Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Teague Donahey

19 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Stay Patent Infringement Case

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Micron Technology, Inc. served on 11/2/2022, answer due 11/23/2022. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

4 #1

complaint

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Micron Technology, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

1 #3

Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Tradem

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER. Defendants Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) is now due on January 13, 2023. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate and Stay Patent Infringement Cases Pending Outcome of Related ITC Litigation filed by Micron Technology, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teague Donahey in Support)(Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION Unopposed Motion for Additional Briefing to Address New Facts Regarding Motion to Consolidate and Stay re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate and Stay Patent Infringement Cases Pending Outcome of Related ITC Litigation Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 1/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teague Donahey in Support)(Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate and Stay Patent Infringement Cases Pending Outcome of Related ITC Litigation filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Replies due by 12/15/2022.(McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kassi Yukevich for Bell Semiconductor, LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kassi Yukevich. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2480077.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Plaintiff Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Responses due by 12/6/2022 (McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate and Stay Patent Infringement Cases Pending Outcome of Related ITC Litigation Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Stay Patent Infringement Cases Pending Outcome of Related ITC Litigation, #2 Declaration of Teague Donahey in Support of Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate and Stay Patent Infringement Cases Pending Outcome of Related ITC Litigation, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #11 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #12 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #13 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #14 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Teague Donahey, #15 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Teague Donahey)(Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christopher Clayton for Bell Semiconductor, LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher Clayton. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2477770.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Plaintiff Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Responses due by 11/30/2022 (McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jason K. Yu. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2476356.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeremy Jason Lang. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2476354.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jared Bobrow. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2476350.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Teague Ian Donahey on behalf of Micron Technology, Inc. (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Micron Technology, Inc. served on 11/2/2022, answer due 11/23/2022. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)7,396,760 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 complaint) (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Micron Technology, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Micron Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2466981.), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bell Semiconductor, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason K. Yu