This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2022 at 09:29:05 (UTC).

Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Micron Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 Bell Semiconductor, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Micron Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Semiconductor, LLC

Defendant

Micron Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander P. McLaughlin

Attorney at Givens Pursley LLP

P O Box 2720

Boise, ID 83701

Jason Blakley

Attorney at Givens Pursley LLP

601 W Bannock Street

Boise, ID 83702

Defendant Attorneys

Jared Bobrow

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jason Lang

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jingyuan Luo

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Tammy Su

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Teague Ian Donahey

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

800 West Main Street, Suite 1750

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Tradem

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Micron Technology, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Micron Technology, Inc. served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Teague Ian Donahey on behalf of Micron Technology, Inc. (Donahey, Teague)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Donahey, Teague)

#9

(#9) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jared Bobrow. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2451698.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

#10

(#10) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeremy Jason Lang. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2451703.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

#11

(#11) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jingyuan Luo. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2451704.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

#12

(#12) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Tammy Su. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2451709.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bell Semiconductor, LLC and counsel for Micron Technology, Inc. re #7 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/18/2022. (jd)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Based upon the stipulation of the parties (Dkt. #15 ), Defendant shall have until October 31, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bell Semiconductor, LLC and counsel for Micron Technology, Inc. re #7 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/18/2022. (jd)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 , #10 , #11 and #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jared Bobrow,Jeremy Jason Lang,Jingyuan Luo and Tammy Su for Micron Technology, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Tammy Su. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2451709.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jingyuan Luo. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2451704.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeremy Jason Lang. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2451703.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jared Bobrow. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2451698.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Teague Ian Donahey on behalf of Micron Technology, Inc. (Donahey, Teague)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Micron Technology, Inc. served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:22-cv-00375-DCN. (jd)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (lat)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Micron Technology, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action, patent no. U.S. 7,260,803 and U.S. 7,149,989. (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jd)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Micron Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2442427.), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(McLaughlin, Alexander)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bell Semiconductor, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jingyuan Luo