This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2022 at 10:55:11 (UTC).

Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Infineon Technologies America Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 Bell Semiconductor, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Infineon Technologies America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-11385

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Semiconductor, LLC

Defendant

Infineon Technologies America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William F. McGonigle, III

Alexandra Figari Easley

Ashley Moore

Christopher Reed Clayton

David Sochia

Richard A. Kamprath

Paul Richter

Raymond P. Ausrotas

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Hoffman

Jared A. Smith

Daniel Haran Wade

 

Court Documents

23 #2

Text of Proposed Order

23 #1

Declaration of Ashley Moore

#23

(#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ashley Moore Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9542290 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Moore, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ausrotas, Raymond) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

22 #2

Text of Proposed Order

22 #1

Declaration of Alexandra Easley

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra Easley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9542286 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra Easley, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ausrotas, Raymond) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

21 #2

Text of Proposed Order

21 #1

Declaration of Richard Kamprath

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Kamprath Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9542279 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Kamprath, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ausrotas, Raymond) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Category Cover Sheet

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit EX E to Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit EX D to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit EX B to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit EX A to Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ashley Moore. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alexandra Easley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard Kamprath. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Sochia. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ashley Moore Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9542290 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Moore, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ausrotas, Raymond) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra Easley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9542286 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra Easley, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ausrotas, Raymond) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Kamprath Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9542279 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Kamprath, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ausrotas, Raymond) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Sochia Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9542273 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Sochia, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ausrotas, Raymond) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Richter on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Richter, Paul) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Reed Clayton on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Clayton, Christopher) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jared A. Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David M. Hoffman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jared A. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9510238 by Infineon Technologies America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Jared A. Smith)(Wade, Daniel) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David M. Hoffman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9510221 by Infineon Technologies America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of David M. Hoffman)(Wade, Daniel) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Haran Wade on behalf of Infineon Technologies America Corporation (Wade, Daniel) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Infineon Technologies America Corporation served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Acknowledgement filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (McGonigle, William) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Infineon Technologies America Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Infineon Technologies America Corporation Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9470367 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit EX B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit EX C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit EX D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit EX E to Complaint, # 6 A0120 REFER TO ENTRY #3 , #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(McGonigle, William) Modified on 8/26/2022: Removed AO120 to properly file in separate entry (de Oliveira, Flaviana). (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less