This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2023 at 16:15:59 (UTC).

Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 Bell Semiconductor, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01293

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Semiconductor, LLC

Defendants

Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Acer, Inc.

HP Inc.

Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company

Lenovo (United States) Inc.

Super Micro Computer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher S. Ponder

Eric K. Gill

Ericka J. Schulz

Frederick L. Cottrell, III

Harper S. Batts

Jeffrey Liang

Lai L. Yip

James P. Brogan

Peter Sauer

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) SO ORDERED, re #32 Joint MOTION to Stay all further proceedings until February 3, 2023, filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/9/2023. (kmd) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#32

(#32) Joint MOTION to Stay all further proceedings until February 3, 2023 - filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#31

(#31) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Friel, Jr. - filed by Super Micro Computer, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#30

(#30) SO ORDERED, re #29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motion to Sever and Stay and Motion to Dismiss to January 17, 2023, filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Reset Briefing Schedule: re #24 MOTION DEFENDANTS ACER, HP, HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE, LENOVO, AND SUPER MICROS MOTION TO SEVER AND STAY, #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Answering Brief due 1/17/2023. Reply Brief due 2/7/2023. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/29/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

27 #1

Proposed Order

27 #27

Main Document

24 #2

Rule 7.1.1 Certification

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

24 #24

Main Document

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #1

Exhibit A

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) SO ORDERED, re #32 Joint MOTION to Stay all further proceedings until February 3, 2023, filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/9/2023. (kmd) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) Joint MOTION to Stay all further proceedings until February 3, 2023 - filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSO ORDERED, re #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Friel, Jr., filed by Super Micro Computer, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/3/2023. (kmd) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Friel, Jr. - filed by Super Micro Computer, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) SO ORDERED, re #29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motion to Sever and Stay and Motion to Dismiss to January 17, 2023, filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Reset Briefing Schedule: re #24 MOTION DEFENDANTS ACER, HP, HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE, LENOVO, AND SUPER MICROS MOTION TO SEVER AND STAY, #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Answering Brief due 1/17/2023. Reply Brief due 2/7/2023. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/29/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motion to Sever and Stay and Motion to Dismiss to January 17, 2023 - filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Acer, Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., HP Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Super Micro Computer, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/3/2023. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Acer, Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., HP Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Super Micro Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Peter Sauer and James P. Brogan for Super Micro Computer, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC.Super Micro Computer, Inc. served on 10/17/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC.Lenovo (United States) Inc. served on 10/17/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC.Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company served on 10/17/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC.Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. served on 10/17/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01292-CFC, 1:22-cv-01293-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (smg) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Semiconductor, LLC filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (smg) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,640,333 ; US 8,049,340 ; US 8,288,269 ; US 8,319,343 ; US 8,933,737. (smg) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Acer, Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., HP Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Super Micro Computer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3972683.) - filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less