This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2022 at 10:18:11 (UTC).

Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 Bell Semiconductor, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel Kelley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-11783

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Angel Kelley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Semiconductor, LLC

Defendant

Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Reed Clayton

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Paul Richter

Attorney at DEVLIN LAW FIRM LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

William F. McGonigle, III

Attorney at Arrowood LLP

10 Post Office Square, 7Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02109

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Scott Ponder

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

1540 El Camino Real, Suite 120

Menlo Park, CA 94025

David S. Godkin

Attorney at Birnbaum & Godkin, LLP

1 Marina Park Drive, Suite 1410

Boston, MA 02210

Ericka Jacobs Schulz

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

12275 El Camino Real, Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92130

Harper Batts

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

1540 El Camino Real, Suite 120

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jeffrey Liang

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

1540 El Camino Real, Suite 120

Menlo Park, CA 94025

James E. Kruzer

Attorney at Birnbaum & Godkin, LLP

1 Marina Park Drive, Suite 1410

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#24

RESTRICTED

#20

(#20) NOTICE by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Joint Notice of Assent to Consolidation (Batts, Harper) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#19

(#19) STATUS REPORT Joint by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Batts, Harper) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

17 #3

Exhibit C

17 #2

Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 11/20/2022)

15 #4

Schulz Certificate

15 #3

Liang Certificate

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#2

(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Category Form

1 #4

Draft Summons

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9547313 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Draft Summons, #5 Category Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10632-AK, 1:22-cv-11383-AK, 1:22-cv-11696-AK, 1:22-cv-11783-AK(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Transcript of Status Conference held on November 22, 2022, before Judge Angel Kelley. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 12/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10632-AK, 1:22-cv-11383-AK, 1:22-cv-11696-AK, 1:22-cv-11783-AK(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#23) District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES entered. The court hereby consolidates for pretrial purposes the 22-cv-11783-AK action. All pleadings shall continue to be filed in the lead case, 22-cv-10632-AK. All pending pleadings in the member cases, including motions to dismiss and amended complaints, should be refiled in the lead case. Additionally, filings must reflect within the case caption the lead action, and any applicable related action. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10632-AK, 1:22-cv-11783-AK(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#22) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Angel Kelley added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #20 Joint Notice of Assent to Consolidation filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. With the assent of the parties and the concurrence of Judge Kelley this matter is reassigned to Judge Kelley.(Belmont, Kellyann) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Joint Notice of Assent to Consolidation (Batts, Harper) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STATUS REPORT Joint by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Batts, Harper) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#18) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties shall file a joint status report by November 28, 2022 stating their joint or separate positions as to whether this case is related to or should be consolidated with any other case.(Belmont, Kellyann) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 11/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Harper Batts, Christopher Ponder, Jeffrey Liang and Ericka Schulz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Godkin on behalf of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. served on 11/2/2022, answer due 11/23/2022. (Clayton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Richter on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Richter, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Reed Clayton on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Clayton, Christopher) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul Richter and Christopher Clayton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul Richter and Christopher Clayton Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9561336 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Richter, #2 Declaration of Christopher Clayton, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9547313 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Draft Summons, #5 Category Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less