This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2022 at 08:23:15 (UTC).

Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 Bell Semiconductor, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel Kelley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-11696

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Angel Kelley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Semiconductor, LLC

Defendant

Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra Figari Easley

Ashley Moore

Christopher Reed Clayton

David Sochia

Richard A. Kamprath

Paul Richter

William F. McGonigle, III

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Scott Ponder

David S. Godkin

Ericka Jacobs Schulz

Harper Batts

Jeffrey Liang

James E. Kruzer

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered " Approved "re #26 Notice of Pending Motion and Conditional Approval, and Request to Assent to Consolidation.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

26 #3

Exhibit C

26 #2

Exhibit B

26 #1

Exhibit A

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Pending Motion and Conditional Approval, and Request to Assent to Consolidation filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Batts, Harper) (Entered: 11/12/2022)

23 #4

Certificate of Ericka Schulz

23 #2

Certificate of Christopher Ponder

23 #1

Certificate of Harper Batts

#23

(#23) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Harper Batts, Christopher Ponder, Jeffrey Liang, Ericka Schulz Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AMADC-9562686 by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Harper Batts, #2 Certificate of Christopher Ponder, #3 Certificate of Jeffrey Liang, #4 Certificate of Ericka Schulz)(Kruzer, James) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet CORRECTED Category Sheet by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Civil Action Cover Sheet

1 #5

Category Form

1 #4

Report on the Filing A0 120

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/22/2022

Docket(#31) District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES entered: The court hereby consolidates for pretrial purposes the related matters pending before this Court, 22-cv-10632, 22-cv-11383, and 22-cv-11696. All pleadings shall continue to be filed in the lead case, 22-cv-10632. All pending pleadings in the member cases, including motions to dismiss and amended complaints, should be refiled in the lead case. Additionally, filings must reflect within the case caption the lead action, and any applicable related action. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10632-AK, 1:22-cv-11383-AK, 1:22-cv-11696-AK.(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

Docket(#30) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Angel Kelley: Status Conference held on 11/22/2022 by video conference.Case called. The Court heard the parties on the pending matter as well as related litigation. Further orders to issue regarding consolidation and pending motions. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Easely, Ausrotas, Richter, and Clayton for Plaintiff; Godkin, Kruzer, Batts, Schulz, and Liang for Defendant) Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10632-AK, 1:22-cv-11383-AK, 1:22-cv-11696-AK(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

Docket(#29) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Status Conference set for 11/22/2022 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Angel Kelley. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10632-AK, 1:22-cv-11383-AK, 1:22-cv-11696-AK (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

Docket(#28) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Angel Kelley added. Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered " Approved "re #26 Notice of Pending Motion and Conditional Approval, and Request to Assent to Consolidation.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) NOTICE of Pending Motion and Conditional Approval, and Request to Assent to Consolidation filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Batts, Harper) (Entered: 11/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Harper Batts, Christopher Ponder, Jeffrey Liang, Ericka Schulz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Allowed re #19 , #20 , #21 , and #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - David Sochia, Richard Kamprath, Ashley Moore, Alexandra Easley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Harper Batts, Christopher Ponder, Jeffrey Liang, Ericka Schulz Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AMADC-9562686 by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Harper Batts, #2 Certificate of Christopher Ponder, #3 Certificate of Jeffrey Liang, #4 Certificate of Ericka Schulz)(Kruzer, James) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra Easley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9561809 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra Easley, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. of Related Cases (Godkin, David) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Godkin on behalf of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul Richter Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9541964 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC.(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Clayton Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9541955 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC.(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet CORRECTED Category Sheet by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (McGonigle, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9529760 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, # 4 Report on the Filing A0 120, #5 Category Form, #6 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(McGonigle, William) Modified on 10/6/2022: Attachment 4 was removed and refiled as it's own entry. (Dore, Samantha). (Entered: 10/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less