This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 08:10:46 (UTC).

Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Case Summary

On April 27, 2022, Bell Semiconductor, LLC (“Bell Semic” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Raymond P. Ausrotas of Arrowood LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (“AMD” or “Defendant”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief and damages for the alleged infringement of United States patent owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the District of Massachusetts.



The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 7,007,259 (“the ’259 patent”). In the complaint, the plaintiff claimed, “The circuit design methodology claimed in the ʼ259 patent is used by AMD in the production of one or more of its semiconductor chips, including its Ryzen 7 1700 processor device. Semiconductor devices include different kinds of materials to function as intended. For example, these devices typically include both metal (i.e., conductor) and insulator materials, which are deposited or otherwise processed sequentially in layers to form the final device.”



The plaintiff claimed, “Prior to development of the methodology described in the ʼ259 patent, the most widely implemented technology for insertion of dummy metal into a circuit design required hardcoding a large ‘stay–away’ distance between the dummy metal and clock nets, which led to less space available for dummy metal insertion. The plaintiff then alleged, “AMD has and continues to directly infringe pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) one or more claims of the ’259 patent by using the patented methodology to design one or more semiconductor devices, including as one example the Ryzen 7 1700 processor device, in the United States.”



The plaintiff then alleged, “AMD employs a variety of design tools, for example, Cadence, Synopsys, and/or Siemens tools, to insert dummy metal into a circuit design (the ‘Accused Processes’) as recited in the ʼ259 patent claims. AMD’s Accused Processes infringe and continue to infringe one or more claims of the ’259 patent during the pendency of the ’259 patent.”



The plaintiff also alleged, “The Bell Semic personnel walked through infringement of the ʼ259 patent and explained that the patent was infringed by a number of AMD devices. After the meeting, Kouros Azimi forwarded the slide deck to the AMD personnel. AMD’s infringement of the ʼ259 patent is thus willful and deliberate. Bell Semic has been damaged by AMD’s infringement of the ʼ259 patent.”



The plaintiff presented one claim for alleged infringement of the ’259 patent owned by the plaintiff. In its prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested judgment declaring that Defendant infringed one or more claims of the ʼ259 patent, a permanent injunction, under 35 U.S.C. § 283, prohibiting Defendant and its officers from committing further acts of infringement, an award of damages, including supplemental post-verdict damages along with pre- and post-judgment interest, and any other relief the court may deem necessary. 



This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10632

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Angel Kelley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Semiconductor, LLC

Defendant

Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond P. Ausrotas

Alexandra Figari Easley

Ashley Moore

David Sochia

Richard A. Kamprath

William F. McGonigle, III

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Ponder

David S. Godkin

Ericka Jacobs Schulz

Harper Batts

James E. Kruzer

Jeffrey Liang

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE STAY/CLOSING entered. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#29

(#29) Proposed Document(s) submitted by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#28

(#28) DECLARATION re #26 Assented to MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) of David S. Godkin by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

27 #1

Exhibit A

27 #27

Main Document

#26

(#26) Assented to MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Figari Easley on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Easley, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Kamprath on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Kamprath, Richard) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by David Sochia on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Sochia, David) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#2

(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

1 #7

AO120

1 #6

proposed Summons

1 #5

Category Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

31 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

06/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE STAY/CLOSING entered. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) Proposed Document(s) submitted by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) DECLARATION re #26 Assented to MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) of David S. Godkin by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 Assented to MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) Assented to MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Figari Easley on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Easley, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Kamprath on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Kamprath, Richard) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by David Sochia on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Sochia, David) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Moore on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Moore, Ashley) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Harper Batts, Christopher Ponder, Jeffrey Liang, and Ericka Schulz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
View All Docket Entries
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra Easley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9330889 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ashley Moore Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9330888 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Sochia Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9330882 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Kamprath Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9330880 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(McGonigle, William) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Bell Semiconductor, LLC served on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. (McGonigle, William) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by William F. McGonigle, III on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (McGonigle, William) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022

Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9295432 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form, #6 proposed Summons (Ausrotas, Raymond) Modified on 4/28/2022 #7 AO120 form deleted and docketed as a separate entry (de Oliveira, Flaviana). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less