This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:35:38 (UTC).

Bell Northern Research, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Intellectual Property - Patent case was filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00286

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Northern Research, LLC

Defendants

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/16/2019. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Abdullah, Sadaf) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Joseph Udick on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Udick, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Michael Hodge on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Hodge, Christopher) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sadaf R Abdullah on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Abdullah, Sadaf) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Skiermont, Paul) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Joseph Skiermont on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Skiermont, Paul) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Skiermont, Paul) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/16/2019. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Abdullah, Sadaf) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Joseph Udick on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Udick, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Michael Hodge on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Hodge, Christopher) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sadaf R Abdullah on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Abdullah, Sadaf) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Skiermont, Paul) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Joseph Skiermont on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Skiermont, Paul) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Skiermont, Paul) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7405747.), filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Skiermont, Paul) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.