This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2021 at 08:38:41 (UTC).

Bell Northern Research, LLC v. Lenovo Group Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On August 13, 2021, Bell Northern Research, LLC (“BNR” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Timothy Devlin of Devlin Law Firm LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Lenovo Group Ltd., Lenovo (United States), Inc. and Motorola Mobility, LLC, (collectively referred to herein as “Lenovo” or “Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages along with costs and expenses for the alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

 

The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the U.S Patent No. 8,204,554 (“the ’554 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 7,319,889 (“the ’889 patent”), U.S. Patent No. RE 48,629 (the ’629 patent), U.S. Patent No 8,416,862 (“the ’862 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 7,957,450 (“the ’450 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 6,941,156 (“the ’156 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 6,696,941 (“the ’941 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 6,963,129 (“the ’129 patent”),U.S. Patent No. 6,858,930 (“the ’930 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 7,039,435 (“the ’435 patent”) (collectively, these patents comprise the “Asserted Patents” or “Patents-in-suit”) owned by the plaintiff. 

 

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged that, “Upon information and belief, Lenovo has and continues to directly or indirectly infringe one or more claims of the ’554 patent, including at least one or more of claims 1, 2, 4-9, and 11-14, by selling, offering to sell, making, using, and/or providing and causing to be used instrumentalities that include a proximity sensor.”

 

The plaintiff further alleged that, “Lenovo has infringed and is infringing, individually and/or jointly, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, at least claims 1, 2, 4-9, and 11-14 of the ’554 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. §§ 271, et seq., directly or indirectly, by making, using, offering for sale, selling, offering for lease, leasing in the United States, and/or importing into the United States without authority or license, the ’554 Accused Instrumentalities.”

 

The plaintiff also alleged that, “Upon information and belief, since Lenovo had knowledge of the ’554 patent, Lenovo has induced and continues to induce others to infringe at least claims 1, 2, 4-9, and 11-14 of the ’554 patent under 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) by, among other things, and with specific intent or willful blindness, actively aiding and abetting others to infringe, including but not limited to Lenovo’s partners and customers, whose use of the ’554 Accused Instrumentalities constitutes direct infringement of at least claims 1, 2, 4-9, and 11-14 of the ’554 patent.”

 

Similar allegations have been made by the plaintiff with reference to the infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

 

There are ten claims for relief laid down by the plaintiff; one for the infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff has requested the court for permanent injunctive relief and an award of damages to be paid by Lenovo adequate to compensate BNR for Lenovo’s past infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,204,554, 7,319,889, RE 48,629, 8,416,862, 7,957,450, 6,941,156, 6,696,941, 6,963,129, 6,858,930, 7,039,435, and any continuing or future infringement through the date such judgment is entered, including interest, costs, expenses, and an accounting of all infringing acts. The plaintiff also requested the court for enhanced damages for willful infringement along with reasonable attorneys’ fees and any other relief the court deems just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00847

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Northern Research, LLC

Defendants

Lenovo Group Ltd.

Lenovo (United States) Inc.

Motorola Mobility, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Klein Ayers

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

2200 Ross Avenue,, 20Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS LENOVO (UNITED STATES), INC., and MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC (Ayers, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Motorola Mobility, LLC served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Lenovo (United States) Inc. served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Lenovo Group Ltd.. (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility, LLC. (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15116190), filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

12 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Lenovo (United States) Inc. answer due 10/25/2021; Motorola Mobility, LLC answer due 10/25/2021. (mc5) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS LENOVO (UNITED STATES), INC., and MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC (Ayers, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Motorola Mobility, LLC served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Lenovo (United States) Inc. served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Lenovo Group Ltd.. (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility, LLC. (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15116190), filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bell Northern Research, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lenovo Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Klein Ayers