This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:27:14 (UTC).

Bell Northern Research, LLC v. Dell Technologies Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Bell Northern Research, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Dell Technologies Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00909

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Northern Research, LLC

Defendants

Dell Technologies Inc.

Dell Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel C. Callaway

Attorney at Farella Braun + Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Eugene Y. Mar

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel, LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

James L. Day

Attorney at Farella Braun + Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, P.C.

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Sushila Chanana

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel, LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James L. Day. Attorney added for Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel C. Callaway. Attorney added for Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus (on behalf of James L. Day) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15280357) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus (on behalf of Daniel C Callaway) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15280342) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sushila Chanana on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. Attorney Sushila Chanana added to party Dell Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sushila Chanana added to party Dell Technologies Inc.(pty:dft) (Chanana, Sushila) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene Y. Mar on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. Attorney Eugene Y. Mar added to party Dell Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene Y. Mar added to party Dell Technologies Inc.(pty:dft) (Mar, Eugene) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#4

#3

2 #1

proposed summons

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James L. Day. Attorney added for Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel C. Callaway. Attorney added for Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus (on behalf of James L. Day) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15280357) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus (on behalf of Daniel C Callaway) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15280342) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sushila Chanana on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. Attorney Sushila Chanana added to party Dell Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sushila Chanana added to party Dell Technologies Inc.(pty:dft) (Chanana, Sushila) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene Y. Mar on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. Attorney Eugene Y. Mar added to party Dell Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene Y. Mar added to party Dell Technologies Inc.(pty:dft) (Mar, Eugene) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Dell Inc. and Dell Technologies Inc. answer due 11/12/2021. (lad) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Dell Inc. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Dell Technologies Inc. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Dell Technologies Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Dell Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons)(Devlin, Timothy) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/1/2021) (lad). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/1/2021) (lad). (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15179142), filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bell Northern Research, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dell Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Chilton Callaway