This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2021 at 08:53:10 (UTC).

Bell Northern Research, LLC v. CommScope Holding Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Bell Northern Research, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CommScope Holding Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00941

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Northern Research, LLC

Defendants

CommScope Holding Company, Inc.

CommScope Inc.

Ruckus Wireless Inc.

ARRIS International Limited

ARRIS Global Ltd.

ARRIS US Holdings, Inc.

Arris Solutions, Inc.

ARRIS Technology, Inc.

ARRIS Enterprises, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for All Defendants to November 19, 2021 by Bell Northern Research, LLC (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. All Defendants. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Ruckus Wireless Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to CommScope Holding Company, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to CommScope Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to ARRIS US Holdings, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to ARRIS Technology, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Arris Solutions, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to ARRIS Enterprises, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: All Defendants answer due November 19, 2021. (ir) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for All Defendants to November 19, 2021 by Bell Northern Research, LLC (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. All Defendants. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Ruckus Wireless Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to CommScope Holding Company, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to CommScope Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to ARRIS US Holdings, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to ARRIS Technology, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Arris Solutions, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to ARRIS Enterprises, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15211218), filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARRIS TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Arris Enterprises LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARRIS Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC is a litigant