This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 09:17:45 (UTC).

BELL et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 BELL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00779

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMAS P. BELL

BELL, THOMAS LLC

Defendants

PRESIDENT

JOE BIDEN

CIA

UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

EIGHTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS

YMCA

 

Court Documents

27 #1

USCA Order

#27

(#27) MOTION to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(LBT) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#26

(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, Defendant, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL.(AAS) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#25

(#25) NEW COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL.(AAS) Modified on 5/18/2021 (AAS). (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#24

(#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL.(AAS) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#23

(#23) ORDER STRIKING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION - The court now STRIKES Thomas Bell's Motion for Judicial Intervention #20 for reasons stated in the court's previous orders. #15 and #22 . Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/10/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER Striking #16 Amended Complaint - SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/10/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#20

(#20) ***STRICKEN BY #23 *** MOTION for Default Judgment and Request for Judicial Intervention, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AAS) Modified on 5/10/2021 (JRB). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#15

(#23) ORDER STRIKING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION - The court now STRIKES Thomas Bell's Motion for Judicial Intervention #20 for reasons stated in the court's previous orders. #15 and #22 . Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/10/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Talk Personally to an Investigator, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AAS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Investigation, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AAS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Fee Waiver Until Case is Won, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AAS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL.(AAS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 isGRANTED. While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fees. Having screened Bell's Complaint, Bell is hereby directed to file an Amended Complaint by May 12, 2021. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/12/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Removal out of the USA, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#5) ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 isGRANTED. While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fees. Having screened Bell's Complaint, Bell is hereby directed to file an Amended Complaint by May 12, 2021. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/12/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOE BIDEN, CIA, EIGHTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS, PRESIDENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT, YMCA, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL. (No fee paid with this filing).(AKH) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(LBT) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, Defendant, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL.(AAS) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NEW COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL.(AAS) Modified on 5/18/2021 (AAS). (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL.(AAS) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER STRIKING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION - The court now STRIKES Thomas Bell's Motion for Judicial Intervention #20 for reasons stated in the court's previous orders. #15 and #22 . Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/10/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Striking #16 Amended Complaint - SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/10/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ***STRICKEN BY #23 *** MOTION for Default Judgment and Request for Judicial Intervention, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AAS) Modified on 5/10/2021 (JRB). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) USCA Case Number 21-1807 for #17 Notice of Appeal filed by THOMAS P. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Rule 3(b) Notice)(LBT) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #17 Notice of Appeal. - for Court of Appeals Use Only. (LBT) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PARTIES' SHORT RECORD re #17 Notice of Appeal - Instructions for Attorneys/Parties attached. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff.) (LBT) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND CLOSING CASE - Bell is reminded that the court has the authority to restrict his ability to file actions and to assess fines against him for filing frivolous cases. The court may elect to use this power if Bell does not cease filing frivolous lawsuits. All pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. Bell's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and this case is now CLOSED. Final judgment shall enter accordingly. SEE ORDER. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/21/2021.(AAS) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Talk Personally to an Investigator, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AAS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Investigation, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AAS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Fee Waiver Until Case is Won, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AAS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL.(AAS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 isGRANTED. While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fees. Having screened Bell's Complaint, Bell is hereby directed to file an Amended Complaint by May 12, 2021. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/12/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Removal out of the USA, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiffs THOMAS P. BELL, BELL, THOMAS LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOE BIDEN, CIA, EIGHTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS, PRESIDENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT, YMCA, filed by BELL, THOMAS LLC, THOMAS P. BELL. (No fee paid with this filing).(AKH) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELL, THOMAS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRESIDENT is a litigant

Latest cases where CIA is a litigant

Latest cases where YMCA is a litigant