This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2020 at 13:51:45 (UTC).

Bell et al v. Continental Production Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Bell filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Continental Production Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01654

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Idell Bell

Rashard Tatum

Defendants

Craig Corbell

CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chris R Miltenberger

Attorney at Law Office of Chris R. Miltenberger, PLLC

1360 N White Chapel, Ste 200

Southlake, TX 76092

Defendant Attorney

Jay W Dale

Attorney at Attorney at Law

3334 Richmond, Ste 218

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Brandon J. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Idell Bell, Rashard Tatum, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2020. (Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#7

(#7) Joint RESPONSE , filed by Continental Production Services, Inc., Craig Corbell. (Dale, Jay) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/13/2020) (ShadiaNash, 4). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Idell Bell, Rashard Tatum, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24651792) filed by Idell Bell, Rashard Tatum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Brandon J. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Idell Bell, Rashard Tatum, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2020. (Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint RESPONSE , filed by Continental Production Services, Inc., Craig Corbell. (Dale, Jay) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/13/2020) (ShadiaNash, 4). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Idell Bell, Rashard Tatum, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24651792) filed by Idell Bell, Rashard Tatum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant