This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2021 at 11:09:03 (UTC).

Belknap v. Baldwin et al (INMATE 3)

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Belknap filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Baldwin INMATE 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerusha T. Adams and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bruce Allen Belknap

Elmore, AL 36025

Defendants

Jeffery Baldwin

Steven T. Marshall

State of Alabama

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Kristi Oggs Wilkerson

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

P O Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #14

Exhibit N - Alacourt.com search results

11 #13

Exhibit M - ACIS search results

11 #12

Exhibit L - Order denying Rule 32 petition

11 #11

Exhibit K - Objection to motion to dismiss

11 #10

Exhibit J - State's Motion to dismiss Rule 32 petition

11 #9

Exhibit I - Rule 32 petition

11 #8

Exhibit H - Case action summary - CC-13-319.60

11 #7

Exhibit G - Order denying motion to withdraw guilty plea

11 #6

Exhibit F - Motion to withdraw guilty plea

11 #5

Exhibit E - Sentencing order

11 #4

Exhibit D - Order amending indictment

11 #2

Exhibit B - Indictment

11 #1

Exhibit A - Case action summary

#11

#10

#9

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 3/23/2021, Belknap shall show cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed as it was not filed within AEDPA's one-year limitation period and for the other reasons asserted by Respondents. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/3/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to Habeas Petition by Jeffery Baldwin, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case action summary, #2 Exhibit B - Indictment, #3 Exhibit C - Guilty plea agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Order amending indictment, #5 Exhibit E - Sentencing order, #6 Exhibit F - Motion to withdraw guilty plea, #7 Exhibit G - Order denying motion to withdraw guilty plea, #8 Exhibit H - Case action summary - CC-13-319.60, #9 Exhibit I - Rule 32 petition, #10 Exhibit J - State's Motion to dismiss Rule 32 petition, #11 Exhibit K - Objection to motion to dismiss, #12 Exhibit L - Order denying Rule 32 petition, #13 Exhibit M - ACIS search results, #14 Exhibit N - Alacourt.com search results)(Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendants Jeffery Baldwin & Steven T. Marshall. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeffery Baldwin, Steven T. Marshall. (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Oggs Wilkerson on behalf of Jeffery Baldwin, Steven T. Marshall (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #6 Order, signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall, served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #6 Order, signed by CAP C19 for Jeffery Baldwin, served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 3/2/2021, as further set out in Order; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Baldwin & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/8/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING petitioner's #2 & #4 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this action under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/8/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Bruce Allen Belknap. (am, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: DIRECTING that by 2/10/2021, Belknap shall: (1) file a properly completed form for a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) submit a prison account statement, as further set out in Order; or Belknap shall submit the $5.00 filing fee for a 2254 petition; DIRECTING the Clerk to send Belknap a form for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide the account clerk at the Elmore Correctional Facility with a copy of this order, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 1/27/2021. (Mailed w/IFP form to plaintiff; Account clerk @ ECF, as directed) (am, ) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Bruce Allen Belknap. (hrs, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/27/2021to redact personal information contained in main pdf pursuant to the E-Government Rules) (am, ). (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bruce Allen Belknap.(hrs, ) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristi O Wilkerson