This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 07:50:01 (UTC).

Belen Acevedo v. Dolphinshire/Greenbrier, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Belen Acevedo filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Dolphinshire/Greenbrier, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Belen Acevedo

Defendants

Does 1-10

Dolphinshire/Greenbrier, LLC

S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Phyl Grace

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

 

Court Documents

16 #2

proof of service

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25180823 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Belen Acevedo(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim. Further, an inadequate response will result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lom) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc answer now due 3/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc.(Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc(pty:dft))(Chang, Hyunsuk) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo, upon Defendant Dolphinshire/Greenbrier, LLC served on 2/15/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Kevin S Pitts in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 3/2/2020, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (doc. #16 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 4/3/2020. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

11 #4

Exhibit 2

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 proof of service)(Grace, Phyl) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

11 #5

Proof of service

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING STATE-LAW CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim, and the claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing in state court. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedoto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

11 #1

Declaration

#10

(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit 1

16 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo, upon Defendant S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc served on 1/29/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Ae Chun Yoo in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

11 #2

Declaration

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 3/2/2020, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (doc. #16 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 4/3/2020. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 proof of service)(Grace, Phyl) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo, upon Defendant Dolphinshire/Greenbrier, LLC served on 2/15/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Kevin S Pitts in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo, upon Defendant S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc served on 1/29/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Ae Chun Yoo in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc answer now due 3/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc.(Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc(pty:dft))(Chang, Hyunsuk) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING STATE-LAW CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim, and the claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing in state court. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedoto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim. Further, an inadequate response will result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lom) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Dolphinshire/Greenbrier, LLC, S.T. Waterfront Cafe Inc. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25180823 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Belen Acevedo(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.