This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:12:06 (UTC).

Belcher v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Belcher filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cristina D. Silva and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cristina D. Silva

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gail Belcher

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

American Express, Inc.

Capital One Bank, USA, NA

Discover Financial Services, Inc.

Synchrony Financial doing business as SYNCB/Amazon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerardo Avalos

Attorney at Freedom Law Firm

8985 S Eastern Ave, Suite 350

Las Vegas, NV 89123

George Haines

Attorney at Freedom Law Firm

8985 S. Eastern Ave., Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Defendant Attorneys

Robert R. McCoy

Attorney at Kaempfer Crowell

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 650

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Sihomara L. Graves

Attorney at Kaempfer Crowell

50 West Liberty Street, Suite 700

Reno, NV 89501

Karyna Armstrong

Attorney at McDonald Carano LLP

2300 West Sahara Avenue, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

J Christopher Jorgensen

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

3993 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Brittni A. Tanenbaum

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

3993 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Capital One Bank, USA, NA. (Armstrong, Karyna) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Synchrony Financial. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Tanenbaum, Brittni) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, And Defenses to the Complaint filed by Synchrony Financial. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/16/2023.(Tanenbaum, Brittni) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/30/2023)

4 #5

Summons

4 #4

Summons

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

4 #4

Main Document

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gail Belcher. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Avalos, Gerardo) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

1 #7

Summons Synchrony

1 #6

Summons Discover

1 #5

Summons Capital One

1 #4

Summons AMEX

1 #3

Summons Experian

1 #2

Summons Trans Union

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER Granting #26 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Capital One Bank, USA, NA answer re #1 Complaint due 3/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Capital One Bank, USA, NA. (Armstrong, Karyna) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Express, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER Granting #22 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). American Express, Inc. answer re #1 Complaint due 3/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2023. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendant American Express, Inc. has failed to do so. Accordingly, American Express, Inc. must file a certificate of interested parties no later than March 14, 2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AJZ) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant American Express, Inc.. (Graves, Sihomara) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 3/6/2023. In the notice of settlement between plaintiff Gail Belcher and defendant Experian Information Solutions, the plaintiff requests 60 days to finalize settlement documents. ECF No. #20 . Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that dismissal documents, or a joint status report addressing the status of settlement, must be filed on or before May 5, 2023. All other pending deadlines between plaintiff and defendant Experian are vacated. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of settlement with Experian by Gail Belcher.. (Avalos, Gerardo) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Capital One Bank, USA, NA that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank, USA, NA added.. (Armstrong, Karyna) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 2/10/2023. In the notice of settlement (ECF No. #12 ) between plaintiff Gail Belcher and defendant Discover Financial Services, Inc, the plaintiff requests 60 days to finalize settlement documents. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that dismissal documents, or a joint status report addressing the status of settlement, must be filed on or before April 14, 2023. All other pending deadlines between plaintiff and defendant Discover are hereby vacated. (no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB) Modified on 3/6/2023 (JLB). (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Experian to File a Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Gail Belcher. Responses due by 2/14/2023. (Avalos, Gerardo) (answer) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gail Belcher. Discover Financial Services, Inc. served on 1/18/2023. (Avalos, Gerardo) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gail Belcher. Synchrony Financial served on 1/18/2023. (Avalos, Gerardo) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Synchrony Financial. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Tanenbaum, Brittni) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, And Defenses to the Complaint filed by Synchrony Financial. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/16/2023.(Tanenbaum, Brittni) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (TRW) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (TRW) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gail Belcher. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Avalos, Gerardo) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7171675) by Gail Belcher. Proof of service due by 4/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Trans Union, #3 Summons Experian, #4 Summons AMEX, #5 Summons Capital One, #6 Summons Discover, #7 Summons Synchrony) (Avalos, Gerardo) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less