This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2019 at 07:54:20 (UTC).

BELANGER v. APPLE, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 BELANGER filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against APPLE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Lauren Fleischer Louis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-23623

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Lauren Fleischer Louis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUSTIN BELANGER

Defendant

APPLE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam M. Moskowitz

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm, PLLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6036

Adam Abraham Schwartzbaum

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601, Coral Gables

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Howard Mitchell Bushman

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm, PLLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorneys

John F. O'Sullivan

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

600 Brickell Ave., Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Alexander N. Harris

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

Joshua H. Lerner

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

Eugene Novikov

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jason David Sternberg

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

600 Brickell Ave, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Robert Clayton Leitner, II

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Paige Spencer Comparato

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

600 Brickell Ave, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33028

 

Court Documents

#23

22 #1

Exhibit A - Agreement

#22

21 #2

Text of Proposed Order

21 #1

Exhibit A

#21

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

#18

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2019., Discovery due by 7/14/2020., Fact Discovery due by 7/14/2020., Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2019., Mediation Deadline 7/28/2020., In Limine Motions due by 8/5/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 8/5/2020., Motions due by 8/5/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/26/2020., Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 11/3/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 7/28/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law - Oral Argument Requested ( Responses due by 11/4/2019), MOTION for Hearing re 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, #1 Complaint, by APPLE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement)(O'Sullivan, John) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AUSTIN BELANGER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time for the parties to submit their joint scheduling report by October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time FOR THE PARTIES TO SUBMIT JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by AUSTIN BELANGER. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by APPLE, INC. (O'Sullivan, John) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Joshua H. Lerner. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Alexander N. Harris. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Eugene Novikov. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua H. Lerner. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12013372 by APPLE, INC.. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Joshua H. Lerner, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(O'Sullivan, John) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Class Action Complaint by APPLE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exh. A - Proposed Order)(O'Sullivan, John) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Clayton Leitner, II on behalf of APPLE, INC.. Attorney Robert Clayton Leitner, II added to party APPLE, INC.(pty:dft). (Leitner, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Spencer Comparato on behalf of APPLE, INC.. Attorney Paige Spencer Comparato added to party APPLE, INC.(pty:dft). (Comparato, Paige) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason David Sternberg on behalf of APPLE, INC.. Attorney Jason David Sternberg added to party APPLE, INC.(pty:dft). (Sternberg, Jason) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John F. O'Sullivan on behalf of APPLE, INC.. Attorney John F. O'Sullivan added to party APPLE, INC.(pty:dft). (O'Sullivan, John) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AUSTIN BELANGER. APPLE, INC. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to APPLE, INC.. (ebz) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against APPLE, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11942777, filed by AUSTIN BELANGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander N. Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige Spencer Comparato

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason David Sternberg